This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2021 at 09:27:45 (UTC).

Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles P. Kocoras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03915

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles P. Kocoras

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC

Calvin Klein Trademark Trust

Calvin Klein, Inc.

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

calvinkleinonderbroeken.com

calvinkleinonlinesrbija.com

calvinkleinonlineus.com

calvinkleinrebajas.com

calvinkleinsaleireland.com

ckonlineaustralia.com

tommyhilfigerireland.top

tommyhilfigermexico.com

tommyhilfigersouthafrica.com

tommysouthafrica.com

ademobenin.com

brandbund.online

calvinkleinchlie.com

disfood.store

fashion-italy.boutique

greatimeshopping.com

189 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Isaku Begert

Attorney at Greer, Burns And Crain, Ltd.

300 S Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Other Attorneys

Tianyu Ju

Attorney at Glacier Law PLLC

200 E. Randolph Dr., Ste. 5100

Chicago, IL 60601

Tao Liu

Attorney at Glacier Law PLLC

200 Park Avenue, Suite 1703

New York, NY 10166

Ruoting Men

Attorney at Glacier Law PLLC

200 East Randolph, Suite 5100

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc., Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC as to a Certain Defendant (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#42

(#42) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants seegana.com, toswers.com, wersar.com by Tianyu Ju (Ju, Tianyu) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#41

(#41) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant wantcloth.com by Ruoting Men (Men, Ruoting) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

#40

(#40) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant wantcloth.com by Tianyu Ju (Ju, Tianyu) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

#39

(#39) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant wantcloth.com by Tao Liu (Liu, Tao) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

#38

(#38) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/25/2021. Plaintiffs' motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #34 is granted. The law firm of Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd. is hereby ordered to add ALL defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days, instructions can be found on the court's website located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/instructions. Mailed notice(vcf, ) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

37 #1

Declaration of Isaku M. Begert

#37

(#37) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC, Calvin Klein, Inc., Calvin Klein Trademark Trust as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Isaku M. Begert)(Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#34

(#35) MEMORANDUM by Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc., Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #34 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION by Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc., Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc., Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC Schedule A regarding complaint, #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc., Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC as to a Certain Defendant (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants seegana.com, toswers.com, wersar.com by Tianyu Ju (Ju, Tianyu) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant wantcloth.com by Ruoting Men (Men, Ruoting) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant wantcloth.com by Tianyu Ju (Ju, Tianyu) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant wantcloth.com by Tao Liu (Liu, Tao) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: calvinkleinonderbroeken.com, calvinkleinonlinesrbija.com, calvinkleinonlineus.com, calvinkleinrebajas.com, calvinkleinsaleireland.com, ckonlineaustralia.com, tommyhilfigerireland.top, tommyhilfigermexico.com, tommyhilfigersouthafrica.com, tommysouthafrica.com, ademobenin.com, brandbund.online, calvinkleinchlie.com, disfood.store, fashion-italy.boutique, greatimeshopping.com, hilfigerindia.com, hilfigermalaysia.com, ledphotoring.com, lighttoggl.store, nobusemina.com, posstory.com, redbaja.com, risparmiaconstileshop.com, sayyesclothing.com, seegana.com, shirtssaleusa.com, shoppipro.com, thehighlandapts.com, thnys.top, thnyss.top, toswers.com, trivasio.com, wegotbrands.com, wersar.com, IAGREE online Store, Tommy-Hilfigers Store, Retro Goddess Store, APLSwimwear Store, LZVCOY Store, Shop4299042 Store, Lipswag Styles Store, bao li Store, Shengxing Store, Cochic Store, FNOCE Store, Awe-inspiring Store, Noger phone fitting 23 Store, Shop5962039 Store, Shop719126 Store, lvOnline, Store, JISOO Store, kAIXING Glasses Store, WANGCHAI888 Store, LvOnline Store, Shop910554236 Store, Shop910988058 Store, Bao Zhuo Store, Ypanlkar Glasses Store, Shop911207201 Store, chiclover Store, XINGER Store, Shop12141391 Store, Kesumvin Store, landlady Store, MENGYAN Store, Children's baby Store, hkjk456 Store, 21centuryboy Store, 89888 Store, X88888Q Store, factory direct sales 2021 Store, AiYiran Store, Trendy beard Store, LemonMM Store, Classic store Store, ac0727-luggage-family Store, Among us kids Hoodie sets Store, 100% cotton 16 Store, Casual 888 Store, lvlu Store, Bingzi Store, zhx2668808 Store, Shop911766538 Store, Children's amusement park Store, wangyifa Store, Stephanie Clothes Store, FEIZHUO Store, AOTUOSI Store, caotai Store, Rick men's Store, FHMR BB Store, at your service Store, 100% cotton T-shirt 58 Store, 100% cotton T-shirt 135 Store, Shop91152021 store Store, Exotic costumes Store, xy123488 Store, Bayote Store, Century Alliance Store, Men trend clothes Store, Tiancheng store Store, zkuku11221122 Store, All seasons spring Store, Cheap The real thing 01 Store, warm sunburst 53719 Store, wzl Store, Fage clothes store Store, Deema Harajuku Store, Qin 0721 Store Store, 5555555555555555555555555555555555555555555555 Store, TOMMY- Store, Suit shop Store, zkuku1122221 Store, PlusQueen Store, Men's suit 888 Store, zkuku112211 Store, UNIQ Store Store, a#hdfbdf161 Store, DeerDenseLL Store, Preface to the West Building Store, chuyuanxuan1992 Store, YF good friend Store, Aliang Store, FGBEENTRILL Store, Childlike2000 Store, zhengshiwu Store, Athlete's No. 3 Store Store, yangying881211 Store, ZHOU Dropshiping Store, fzs369369369 Store, Children's suit world Store, Handsome child and beautiful girl clothes shop Store, Yaoyang Commercial Bank Store, wu36082 Store, XIUXIANFUSHI6309 Store, 2021teens Store, ywq1985 Store, Men's wardrobe 520 Store, Dave-Sportswear Store, fzfs1978198412151015 Store, xy369 Store, Fashionable Men's Wardrobe Store, Children's Sweatshirt Store, Aaete No. 20 Store, 18888888888 Store, 0208 Store, Asmsm Store, All things grow Store, Cc888999 Store, Sofitel 1957 Store, 15888851 Store, xiangyuanfuzhuang Store, Printed clothes shop 111 Store, azlfdfds5245 Store, xmbaichangdaD Store, xiao luo luo Store, Chile life Store, 1233211234567 Store, fzyangqianguanC Store, WHEAT DD Store, qzweishufuE Store, Mr. Xia Store, Men's Wardrobe No. 8 Store, JCYLQ521 Store, Le Maidi Store, xmhanchaoD Store, anutr353238 Store, KALEWENKING Store, okoktop Store, 854867 Store, Chinatownshopping Store, GWYY Store, ttppoo123 Store, JZ888 Store, Trendy Shoe Shop Store, YandX Store, 20210608 Store, New store in 2021 Store, Hoodies and T-shirts for men Store, Sofitel 1959 Store, hefangfushi02 Store, ljwfushi Store, linhao Store, liubowen8886 Store, aoao123 Store, 100% cotton T-shirt MX Store, Good Tees Store, LLWAN Store, HZUK, ggck_belt, ardented.com, brawnety.com, finishety.com, fortuneal.com, heartfeltity.com, impressivets.com, kindnessed.com, reasonees.com, soaringes.com, spectacularcy.com, Teeground.com, wantcloth.com, welcomeal.com and zealoused.com added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/25/2021. Plaintiffs' motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #34 is granted. The law firm of Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd. is hereby ordered to add ALL defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days, instructions can be found on the court's website located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/instructions. Mailed notice(vcf, ) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC, Calvin Klein, Inc., Calvin Klein Trademark Trust as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Isaku M. Begert)(Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE by Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc., Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC re MOTION by Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc., Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC for preliminary injunction #34 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MEMORANDUM by Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc., Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #34 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 TRADEMARKS)(gcy, ) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cl, ) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc., Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by Isaku Begert (Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc., Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc., Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc., Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc., Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Calvin Klein Trademark Trust, Calvin Klein, Inc., Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC Schedule A regarding complaint, #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC, Calvin Klein, Inc., Calvin Klein Trademark Trust; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18489695. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Calvin Klein Trademark Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where Calvin Klein, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant