This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2020 at 07:42:04 (UTC).

Tomlin v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 Tomlin filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Regina S. Edwards and Justin R. Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00871

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Regina S. Edwards

Presiding Judge

Justin R. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Scott Tomlin

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shannon Renee Fauver

Attorney at Fauver Law Office

1752 Frankfort Avenue

Louisville, KY 40206

Defendant Attorney

Timothy D. Thompson

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville

717 W. Broadway

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) Case reassigned to Judge Justin R. Walker pursuant to General Order 2019-11.cc: Counsel, CM-JRW (AEH) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 12/3/2019 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Counsel; USMS (CDF) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case reassigned to Judge Justin R. Walker pursuant to General Order 2019-11.cc: Counsel, CM-JRW (AEH) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 12/24/2019. (CDF) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summonses Issued and forwarded to the USMS as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 (USAG), #2 USM-285 (SSA), #3 USM-285 (USA)) (CDF) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 12/3/2019 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Counsel; USMS (CDF) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Eric Scott Tomlin (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (SMJ) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. (SMJ) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Eric Scott Tomlin. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - 3 tendered) (SMJ) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.