This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:17:45 (UTC).

Tomelleri v. Taunton Rod and Gun, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Tomelleri filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Taunton Rod and Gun, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathaniel M. Gorton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12469

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathaniel M. Gorton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph R. Tomelleri

Defendant

Taunton Rod and Gun, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Julianne C. Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Kenney & Sams PC

45 School Street

Boston, MA 02108

Christopher A. Kenney

Attorney at Kenney & Sams, P.C.

144 Turnpike Road

Southborough, MA 01772

Oliver P Maguire

Attorney at Evans & Dixon, LLC

Building 82, 10851 Mastin Blvd, Suite 900

Overland Park, KS 6210

 

Court Documents

6 #3

Exhibit Affidavit of Oliver P. Maguire

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Oliver P. Maguire Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8043280 by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Admission as an Attorney, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Oliver P. Maguire)(Fitzpatrick, Julianne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Taunton Rod and Gun, Inc. d/b/a Bears Den Fly Fishing Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8002414 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Fitzpatrick, Julianne) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Kenney on behalf of Joseph R. Tomelleri (Kenney, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Taunton Rod and Gun, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed Taunton Rod and Gun, Inc. served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. (Fitzpatrick, Julianne) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

6 #2

Exhibit Cert. of Admission as an Attorney

1 #2

Category Form

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Fitzpatrick, Julianne) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed Taunton Rod and Gun, Inc. served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. (Fitzpatrick, Julianne) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Oliver P. Maguire. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Oliver P. Maguire Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8043280 by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Admission as an Attorney, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Oliver P. Maguire)(Fitzpatrick, Julianne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Taunton Rod and Gun, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Kenney on behalf of Joseph R. Tomelleri (Kenney, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Fitzpatrick, Julianne) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Taunton Rod and Gun, Inc. d/b/a Bears Den Fly Fishing Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8002414 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Fitzpatrick, Julianne) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.