This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 14:40:14 (UTC).

Tom Sawyer Properties L L C v. Scottsdale Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Tom Sawyer Properties L L C filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00995

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tom Sawyer Properties, LLC

Katherine Vidrine

Tom Sawyer Properties L L C

Defendants

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Scottsdale Insurance Co

Special Masters

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Max Emile Guthrie

Attorney at Hoffoss Devall

517 W College St

Lake Charles, LA 70605

Donald W McKnight

Attorney at Hoffoss Devall

517 W College St

Lake Charles, LA 70605

Claude Pierson Devall

Attorney at Hoffoss Devall

517 W College St

Lake Charles, LA 70605

Douglas Cooper Fournet

Attorney at Hoffoss Devall

517 W College St

Lake Charles, LA 70605

Douglas Cooper Fournet,

Attorney at Hoffoss Devall

517 W College St

Lake Charles, LA 70605

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Rae Dietz

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (BR)

701 Main St

Baton Rouge, LA 70062

Richard William Wolff

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Cole Cisco Frazier

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

John Powers Wolff, III

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Sydnee Doolittle Menou

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Special Master Attorneys

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tom Sawyer Properties L L C, Katherine Vidrine. Scottsdale Insurance Co served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (aty,Fournet, Douglas) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scottsdale Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Answer to Complaint, sent to John Powers Wolff, III on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/9/2021. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Co.(Attorney John Powers Wolff, III added to party Scottsdale Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scottsdale Insurance Company. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tom Sawyer Properties, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Katherine Vidrine for Tom Sawyer Properties, LLC. (aty,Fournet, Douglas) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Tom Sawyer Properties, LLC against Scottsdale Insurance Company (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4640066) filed by Tom Sawyer Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Douglas Cooper Fournet added to party Tom Sawyer Properties, LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Fournet, Douglas) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tom Sawyer Properties L L C, Katherine Vidrine. Scottsdale Insurance Co served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (aty,Fournet, Douglas) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scottsdale Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Answer to Complaint, sent to John Powers Wolff, III on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/9/2021. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Co.(Attorney John Powers Wolff, III added to party Scottsdale Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scottsdale Insurance Company. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tom Sawyer Properties, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Katherine Vidrine for Tom Sawyer Properties, LLC. (aty,Fournet, Douglas) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Tom Sawyer Properties, LLC against Scottsdale Insurance Company (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4640066) filed by Tom Sawyer Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Douglas Cooper Fournet added to party Tom Sawyer Properties, LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Fournet, Douglas) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Rae Dietz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard William Wolff

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cole Cisco Frazier