This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/16/2023 at 09:19:17 (UTC).

Tolman et al v. Universal City Development Partners, Ltd.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 Tolman filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Universal City Development Partners, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Wendy W. Berger and Daniel C. Irick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-02148

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wendy W. Berger

Referral Judge

Daniel C. Irick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Danielle Tolman

John Cestaro

Defendant

Universal City Development Partners, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robby Thomas Cook

Attorney at Rob Cook Attorney at Law, PA

Suite A, 904 Anastasia Boulevard

St Augustine, FL 32080

Thomas E. Woods

Attorney at Tom Woods, PA

116 Porto Salvo Dr

Islamorada, FL 33036

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas D. Freeman

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP

111 N Orange Ave Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801-2361

James Peter Greco

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

111 North Orange Avenue, Suite 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Robby Thomas Cook on behalf of John Cestaro, Danielle Tolman. Lead Counsel: Rob T. Cook. (Cook, Robby) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#21

(#21) ORDER: the parties are directed to confer, and then advise the Court, on the selection of a mediator, on or before January 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/3/2023. (RMF) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#20

(#20) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/17/2023 Joinder of Parties due by 3/17/2023 Discovery due by 7/5/2024 Dispositive motions due by 8/6/2024 Pretrial statement due by 12/9/2024 All other motions due by 11/6/2024 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 8/21/2023 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 9/25/2023 Trial Status Conference set for 12/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger Jury Trial set for the January 2025 trial term commencing on 1/6/2025 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 7/19/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/3/2023. (RMF) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Woods on behalf of Danielle Tolman (Woods, Thomas) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#17

(#17) RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Strike #15 Amended Complaint and MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by John Cestaro, Danielle Tolman. (Cook, Robby) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Strike #15 Amended Complaint and, MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Universal City Development Partners, Ltd. (Greco, James) Modified on 12/14/2022 to edit docket text (KNC). (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#15

(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Universal City Development Partners, Ltd. with Jury Demand. filed by John Cestaro, Danielle Tolman.(Cook, Robby) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM in opposition re #6 Motion to Strike, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by John Cestaro, Danielle Tolman. (Cook, Robby) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#6

(#14) MEMORANDUM in opposition re #6 Motion to Strike, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by John Cestaro, Danielle Tolman. (Cook, Robby) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas D. Freeman on behalf of Universal City Development Partners, Ltd. (Freeman, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit "B" to Notice of Removal

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit "A" to Notice of Removal

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

State Court Other Documents

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • Docket(#23) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Mediator: TBD (KNC) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Robby Thomas Cook on behalf of John Cestaro, Danielle Tolman. Lead Counsel: Rob T. Cook. (Cook, Robby) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER: the parties are directed to confer, and then advise the Court, on the selection of a mediator, on or before January 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/3/2023. (RMF) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/17/2023 Joinder of Parties due by 3/17/2023 Discovery due by 7/5/2024 Dispositive motions due by 8/6/2024 Pretrial statement due by 12/9/2024 All other motions due by 11/6/2024 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 8/21/2023 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 9/25/2023 Trial Status Conference set for 12/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger Jury Trial set for the January 2025 trial term commencing on 1/6/2025 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 7/19/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/3/2023. (RMF) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE to Plaintiffs' Counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KNC) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Woods on behalf of Danielle Tolman (Woods, Thomas) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Strike #15 Amended Complaint and MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by John Cestaro, Danielle Tolman. (Cook, Robby) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Strike #15 Amended Complaint and, MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Universal City Development Partners, Ltd. (Greco, James) Modified on 12/14/2022 to edit docket text (KNC). (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Universal City Development Partners, Ltd. with Jury Demand. filed by John Cestaro, Danielle Tolman.(Cook, Robby) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM in opposition re #6 Motion to Strike, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by John Cestaro, Danielle Tolman. (Cook, Robby) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Universal City Development Partners, Ltd. Related case(s): Yes (Greco, James) Modified on 12/1/2022 to edit docket text (KNC). (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Universal City Development Partners, Ltd. (Greco, James) Modified on 12/1/2022 to edit docket text (KNC). (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by John Cestaro, Danielle Tolman. (Cook, Robby) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Strike and Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Universal City Development Partners, Ltd. (Greco, James) Modified on 11/28/2022 to edit docket text (KNC). (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/21/2022. (RMF) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:22-cv-02148-WWB-DCI. (APV) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas D. Freeman on behalf of Universal City Development Partners, Ltd. (Freeman, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the Ninth Judicial Circuit, case number 2022-CA-007020-O filed in State Court on 08/01/2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-20215229 filed by Universal City Development Partners, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit "A" to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit "B" to Notice of Removal)(Greco, James) Modified on 11/18/2022 to edit docket text (KNC). (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less