This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 08:09:03 (UTC).

Toliver v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 Toliver filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ellen L. Hollander. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01447

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ellen L. Hollander

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Toliver

Butner, NC 27509

Defendant

United States of America

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#3

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Envelope

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) ORDER DIRECTING petitioner to file either the $400.00 filing fee or an indigency motion within 21 days; GRANTING USA 60 days to respond. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/7/2019. (c/m w/enclosure)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Motion for Return of Seized Property) against United States of America, filed by Michael Toliver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Envelope)(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Toliver (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER DIRECTING petitioner to file either the $400.00 filing fee or an indigency motion within 21 days; GRANTING USA 60 days to respond. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/7/2019. (c/m w/enclosure)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (Motion for Return of Seized Property) against United States of America, filed by Michael Toliver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Envelope)(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.