This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/05/2023 at 07:35:46 (UTC).

ToLife Technologies PTY LTD et al v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A of the Complaint

Case Summary

On 12/07/2022 ToLife Technologies PTY LTD filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A of the Complaint. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrea R. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06864

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrea R. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TOLIFE TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD

Moshe Maor

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A of the Complaint

BINGDIKA (55)

FuHongCai (56)

Haikouzhengweiyikejiyouxiangongs (57)

AHSED LTD (54)

Mass Design (58)

mdjaijicxa (59)

PioShop Online CA (60)

Showliss SHOWLISS PRO (61)

SUNNYBUY (62)

VUHHDREAM (63)

Wellbuy Store (64)

Yanchuanqixin (65)

YARAY LTD (66)

yuyuxian (67)

100xhobbies (69)

agse45 (70)

almog1300.2013 (71)

66 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anna Iskikian

Attorney at Thoits Law

400 Main St, 250

Los Altos, CA 94022

David Edward Hutchinson

Attorney at Thoits Law

1136 S. Delano Court West, Ste B201, 2068

Chicago, IL 60605

Nathan Daniel Monroe-yavneh

Attorney at Thoits Law

400 Main Street, Suite 250

Los Altos, CA 94022

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moshe Maor, ToLife Technologies PTY LTD as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A of the Complaint on 1/26/2023, answer due 2/16/2023. (Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#28

(#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status and motion hearing held on 1/31/2023. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' second ex parte motion to extend temporary restraining order as to Defendant Nos. 1-53, 68, and 138 24 is granted. Any affected party wishing to appear for the purpose of requesting that the Temporary Restraining Order be lifted or modified may do so on an expedited basis. The Court extends the Temporary Restraining Order an additional 14 days until 2/14/2023. Plaintiffs' motion for entry of a preliminary injunction and to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #26 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order as to those identified 83 defendants. Thoits Law is ordered to add the 83 Defendant names listed in the First Amended Schedule A to the docket within three business days, instructions can be found on the court's website www.ilnd.courts.com/instructions. Telephonic status hearing set for 2/14/2023 at 9:45 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (lma, ) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Motion by David Edward Hutchinson for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction, #26 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 1/31/2023 at 09:30 AM. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

26 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 1 to David E. Hutchinson Declaration (First Amended Schedule A)

26 #2

Declaration Declaration of David E. Hutchinson in support of Motion for Prelimin

26 #1

Supplement Memo in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction

26 #26

Main Document

#25

(#25) Notice of Second Ex Parte Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order [Dkt. 24]. NOTICE of Motion by David Edward Hutchinson for presentment of before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 1/31/2023 at 09:30 AM. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#23

(#23) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Moshe Maor, ToLife Technologies PTY LTD by Anna Iskikian (Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#6

(#6) CLAIM by Moshe Maor, TOLIFE TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD regarding Patent infringements. (Monroe-yavneh, Nathan) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Moshe Maor, TOLIFE TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD (Monroe-yavneh, Nathan) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Moshe Maor, TOLIFE TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD by Nathan Daniel Monroe-yavneh (Monroe-yavneh, Nathan) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Monroe-yavneh, Nathan) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. 3 - Provisionally filed under Seal Schedule A to Complaint slipsheet

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. 2 - WV-Comb Trademark

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1 - Lice Comb Patent

1 #1

Main Document

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moshe Maor, ToLife Technologies PTY LTD as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A of the Complaint on 1/26/2023, answer due 2/16/2023. (Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: BINGDIKA (55), FuHongCai (56), Haikouzhengweiyikejiyouxiangongs (57), AHSED LTD (54), Mass Design (58), mdjaijicxa (59), PioShop Online CA (60), Showliss SHOWLISS PRO (61), SUNNYBUY (62), VUHHDREAM (63), Wellbuy Store (64), Yanchuanqixin (65), YARAY LTD (66), yuyuxian (67), 100xhobbies (69), agse45 (70), almog1300.2013 (71), amitgold1 (72), arielabergelebey (73), elitebestseller (74), global_hub_1 (75), go6u (76), homemj231 (77), ilpe_485 (78), industrial_enterprise (79), itaashtamke0 (80), jceify (81), jennelaluf (82), joinly (83), jojo-2011 (84), kash_3560 (85), kids_style (86), liam4680 (87), lifesolutions28 (88), lina707080 (89), macha_7547 (90), majicorastore (91), minu_mart (92), mmic_9284 (93), natimalk2012 (94), norkicdeals1 (95), ofedanie-5 (96), omrijacob (97), orientbeaut (98), petras_1919 (99), rafich200 (100), seelrathn_0 (101), shahaconstantinovsk0 (102), sharaystore (103), sidil90 (104), thazoda-shop (105), twinsellersdb (106), vikrant-sales (107), welldone-4 (108), winoop (109), wizworldz (110), yaavsh-59 (111), yahar-53 (112), your-store666 (113), zachga-0 (114), zeemakgroup (115), Pet Supermarket (116), CHENGDUHONGNIWUKEJIYOUXIANGONGSI (117), CUSTOM (118), dongguanshiqingshuyuanwangluokejiyouxiangongsi (119), GF-Huinong (120), Jiqiwei Co.ltd (121), Happy One (122), jiningenpingshangmaoyouxiangongsi (123), LIXIN TECH (124), Qingshuyuan (125), RSG (126), shanghaiantuowangluokejiyouxianzerengongsi (127), shenzhenshianlaikejiyouxiaogongsi (128), SLD (129), Tianlu Electronics (130), WEAWE shop (131), weifangchengkaishangmaoyouxiangongsi (132), Yezyy (133), YuanTU (134), fengrui (135), JMZ Creative Land (136) and sale large (137) added to case caption. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status and motion hearing held on 1/31/2023. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' second ex parte motion to extend temporary restraining order as to Defendant Nos. 1-53, 68, and 138 24 is granted. Any affected party wishing to appear for the purpose of requesting that the Temporary Restraining Order be lifted or modified may do so on an expedited basis. The Court extends the Temporary Restraining Order an additional 14 days until 2/14/2023. Plaintiffs' motion for entry of a preliminary injunction and to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #26 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order as to those identified 83 defendants. Thoits Law is ordered to add the 83 Defendant names listed in the First Amended Schedule A to the docket within three business days, instructions can be found on the court's website www.ilnd.courts.com/instructions. Telephonic status hearing set for 2/14/2023 at 9:45 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (lma, ) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Motion by David Edward Hutchinson for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction, #26 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 1/31/2023 at 09:30 AM. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A of the Complaint (kra, ) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION by Plaintiffs Moshe Maor, ToLife Technologies PTY LTD for preliminary injunction and to extend the temporary restraining order. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration Declaration of David E. Hutchinson in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to David E. Hutchinson Declaration (First Amended Schedule A))(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Notice of Second Ex Parte Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order [Dkt. 24]. NOTICE of Motion by David Edward Hutchinson for presentment of before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 1/31/2023 at 09:30 AM. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Moshe Maor, ToLife Technologies PTY LTD by Anna Iskikian (Iskikian, Anna) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiffs' ex parte motion to extend the temporary restraining order 21 is granted. The Court finds good cause to extend the Temporary Restraining Order an additional 14 days until 1/31/2023. Telephonic status hearing set for 1/17/2023 is stricken and reset for 1/31/2023 at 9:30 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (lma, ) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketBOND in the amount of $ 10,000 company check Receipt 4624281144, posted by Thoits Law for plaintiffs Moshe Maor and ToLife Technologies PTY LTD. (jk2, ) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Moshe Maor, TOLIFE TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD by David Edward Hutchinson (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Moshe Maor, TOLIFE TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD Ex. 3 (Parts 1-20) to Moshe Maor Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 3 (2 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 3 (3 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 (4 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 (5 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3 (6 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ex.3 (7 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #7 Exhibit Ex. 3 (8 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #8 Exhibit Ex. 3 (9 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #9 Exhibit Ex. 3 (10 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #10 Exhibit Ex. 3 (11 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #11 Exhibit Ex. 3 (12 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #12 Exhibit Ex. 3 (13 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #13 Exhibit Ex. 3 (14 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #14 Exhibit Ex. 3 (15 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #15 Exhibit Ex. 3 (16 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #16 Exhibit Ex. 3 (17 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #17 Exhibit Ex. 3 (18 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #18 Exhibit Ex. 3 (19 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration, #19 Exhibit Ex. 3 (20 of 20) to Moshe Maor Declaration)(Monroe-yavneh, Nathan) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Plaintiffs Moshe Maor, TOLIFE TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD for leave to file excess pages (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo in support of Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Nathan Monroe-Yavneh, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Attorney Declaration - Jan 2011 Mark Monitor, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Attorney Declaration - 2020 IP Rights Seizures Stat Report, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Attorney Declaration - BASCAP Report, #6 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Attorney Declaration - ICANN Registrar Accreditation Agreement, #7 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Attorney Declaration - Hague Convention on Service Abroad, #8 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Attorney Declaration - Translation of Civil Procedure Law of the People of China, #9 Declaration Declaration of Moshe Maor, #10 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Declaration of Moshe Maor - Lice Comb Patent, #11 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Declaration of Moshe Maor - WV-Comb Trademark)(Monroe-yavneh, Nathan) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLAIM by Moshe Maor, TOLIFE TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD regarding Trademark infringements. (Monroe-yavneh, Nathan) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLAIM by Moshe Maor, TOLIFE TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD regarding Patent infringements. (Monroe-yavneh, Nathan) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Moshe Maor, TOLIFE TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD (Monroe-yavneh, Nathan) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Moshe Maor, TOLIFE TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD Schedule A to Complaint (Monroe-yavneh, Nathan) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Moshe Maor, TOLIFE TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD by Nathan Daniel Monroe-yavneh (Monroe-yavneh, Nathan) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Monroe-yavneh, Nathan) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by TOLIFE TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD, Moshe Maor; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20115204. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Lice Comb Patent, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - WV-Comb Trademark, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Provisionally filed under Seal Schedule A to Complaint slipsheet)(Monroe-yavneh, Nathan) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less