This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/23/2022 at 05:23:49 (UTC).

Todd v. United States et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 Todd filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann M Donnelly and Lois Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05652

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ann M Donnelly

Referral Judge

Lois Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taijay Todd

Thomson, IL 61285

Defendants

United States

Grisom

Megan Verry-Bailey

Respondent

Service List

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

AUSA - Rockford

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (Rockford)

327 South Church Street

Rockford, IL 61101

Prisoner Correspondence 2 - Internal Use Only

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Taijay Todd (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/22/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

1 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/22/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Taijay Todd for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/22/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER; The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York for further consideration. Plaintiff asserts claims concerning the conduct of prison officials at the Metropolitan Detention Center, which is located in the Eastern District of New York. 28 U.S.C. 112(c). Signed by the Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 9/21/2022: Mailed notice (yxp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/22/2022.] (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#5

(#5) TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of New York the electronic record. (jp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/22/2022.] (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 3:22-cv-50313. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/22/2022)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 3:22-cv-50313. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of New York the electronic record. (jp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/22/2022.] (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER; The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York for further consideration. Plaintiff asserts claims concerning the conduct of prison officials at the Metropolitan Detention Center, which is located in the Eastern District of New York. 28 U.S.C. 112(c). Signed by the Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 9/21/2022: Mailed notice (yxp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/22/2022.] (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketMOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis SEE ENTRY #3 by Taijay Todd. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketMAILED copy of the Clerk's Notice entry along with the Joint Consent Form to Taijay Todd. (jp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/22/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/22/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/22/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Taijay Todd for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/22/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/22/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Taijay Todd (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/22/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant