This case was last updated from PACER on 09/09/2021 at 05:52:11 (UTC).

Todd v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 Todd filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-06955

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Todd

Defendant

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeena Renee Jiampetti

Attorney at Springer Ayeni

4319 Piedmont Avenue, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94611

Cassie Springer Ayeni

Attorney at Springer Ayeni, A Professional Law Corporation

4319 Piedmont Ave, 2Nd Floor

Oakland, CA 94611

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by David Todd (Springer Ayeni, Cassie) (Filed on 9/8/2021) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Springer Ayeni, Cassie) (Filed on 9/8/2021) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16367685.). Filed byDavid Todd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Springer Ayeni, Cassie) (Filed on 9/8/2021) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/22/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by David Todd (Springer Ayeni, Cassie) (Filed on 9/8/2021) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Springer Ayeni, Cassie) (Filed on 9/8/2021) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16367685.). Filed byDavid Todd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Springer Ayeni, Cassie) (Filed on 9/8/2021) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Prudential Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeena Renee Jiampetti