This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2021 at 09:58:28 (UTC).

Todd v. Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 Todd filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah S. Vance and Janis van Meerveld. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00550

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah S. Vance

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Wayne Todd

Houma, LA 70363

Defendants

Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government

Richard Neal

EMT Jacob

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Brian John Marceaux

Attorney at Hebert & Marceaux, LLC

4752 Hwy, 311, Suite 114

Houma, LA 70360

Julius P. Hebert, Jr.

Attorney at Hebert & Marceaux

4752 Hwy. 311, Suite 114

Houma, LA 70360

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER Granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to EMT Jacob; Richard Neal and Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government. Answer due 6/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 4/28/2021. (ajn) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Complaint by EMT Jacob, Richard Neal, Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Brian John Marceaux added to party EMT Jacob(pty:dft), Attorney Brian John Marceaux added to party Richard Neal(pty:dft), Attorney Brian John Marceaux added to party Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government(pty:dft).(Marceaux, Brian) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

8 #2

Summons Return

8 #1

Summons Return

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed; EMT Jacob served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021; Richard Neal served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021; Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return, #2 Summons Return)(mm) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

7 #2

Summons

7 #1

Summons

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Richard Neal, Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government, EMT Jacob. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (cc: USM Summons, Complaints and Pauper Order)(ajn) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#6

(#6) PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $25.92 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to David Wayne Todd in monthly payments as set out in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 4/2/2021. (cc: Sheriff)(ajn) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

5 #1

Original Deficient IFP

#5

(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Wayne Todd. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient IFP)(mm) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

4 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against EMT Jacob, Richard Neal, Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government filed by David Wayne Todd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 4/9/2021. (mm) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#2

(#2) DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Wayne Todd. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (mm) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#1

(#1) DEFICIENT: COMPLAINT against EMT Jacob, Richard Neal, Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government filed by David Wayne Todd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to EMT Jacob; Richard Neal and Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government. Answer due 6/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 4/28/2021. (ajn) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Complaint by EMT Jacob, Richard Neal, Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Brian John Marceaux added to party EMT Jacob(pty:dft), Attorney Brian John Marceaux added to party Richard Neal(pty:dft), Attorney Brian John Marceaux added to party Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government(pty:dft).(Marceaux, Brian) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed; EMT Jacob served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021; Richard Neal served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021; Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return, #2 Summons Return)(mm) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Richard Neal, Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government, EMT Jacob. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (cc: USM Summons, Complaints and Pauper Order)(ajn) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $25.92 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to David Wayne Todd in monthly payments as set out in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 4/2/2021. (cc: Sheriff)(ajn) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Wayne Todd. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient IFP)(mm) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against EMT Jacob, Richard Neal, Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government filed by David Wayne Todd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 4/9/2021. (mm) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Wayne Todd. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (mm) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DEFICIENT: COMPLAINT against EMT Jacob, Richard Neal, Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government filed by David Wayne Todd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government Medical Staff is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julius P. Hebert, Jr.