This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/18/2021 at 18:34:54 (UTC).

TODD BENJAMIN INTERNATIONAL, LTD. et al v. TCA Fund Management Group Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2020 TODD BENJAMIN INTERNATIONAL, LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TCA Fund Management Group Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edwin G. Torres and Robert N. Scola, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-21808

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Edwin G. Torres

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TODD BENJAMIN INTERNATIONAL, LTD.

TODD BENJAMIN

Defendants

ALYCE SCHREIBER

WILLIAM FICKLING

ROBERT PRESS

THOMAS DAY

DONNA SILVERMAN

TARA ANTAL

PATRICK PRIMAVERA

TCA Fund Management Group Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron Michael Cohn

Attorney at Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial

2601 S. Bayshore Drive, Suite 1500

Miami, FL 33133-5408

Jason Kenneth Kellogg

Attorney at Levine Kellogg Lehman Schneider + Grossman LLP

201 South Biscayne Boulevard, 22Nd Floor

Miami, FL 33131

Scott Lance Silver

Attorney at Silver Law Group

11780 W. Sample Road

Coral Springs, FL 33065

Jeffrey Clark Schneider

Attorney at Levine Kellogg Lehman Schneider & Grossman LLP

201 South Biscayne Blvd., 22Nd Floor

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Aaron Stenzler Weiss

Attorney at Carlton Fields, P.A.

100 S.E. 2Nd Street, Ste. 4200

Miami, FL 33131-9101

Bruce Judson Berman

Attorney at Carlton Fields, P.A.

100 Se 2Nd Street, Suite 4200

Miami, FL 33131-2114

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #7

Summon(s)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Notice of Dismissal of Claims Against Thomas Day Without Prejudice by TODD BENJAMIN, TODD BENJAMIN INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Cohn, Aaron) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Order Staying and Administratively Closing This Case granting #15 Motion to Stay. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint MOTION to Stay For Entry of an Order Staying and Adminitratively Closing This Case by TODD BENJAMIN. Responses due by 7/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schneider, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce Judson Berman on behalf of TARA ANTAL, WILLIAM FICKLING, ROBERT PRESS, ALYCE SCHREIBER. Attorney Bruce Judson Berman added to party TARA ANTAL(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Judson Berman added to party WILLIAM FICKLING(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Judson Berman added to party ROBERT PRESS(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Judson Berman added to party ALYCE SCHREIBER(pty:dft). (Berman, Bruce) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Stenzler Weiss on behalf of TARA ANTAL, WILLIAM FICKLING, ROBERT PRESS, ALYCE SCHREIBER. Attorney Aaron Stenzler Weiss added to party TARA ANTAL(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Stenzler Weiss added to party WILLIAM FICKLING(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Stenzler Weiss added to party ROBERT PRESS(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Stenzler Weiss added to party ALYCE SCHREIBER(pty:dft). (Weiss, Aaron) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Upcoming Deadline to Serve under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Clark Schneider on behalf of TODD BENJAMIN, TODD BENJAMIN INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Attorney Jeffrey Clark Schneider added to party TODD BENJAMIN(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Clark Schneider added to party TODD BENJAMIN INTERNATIONAL, LTD.(pty:pla). (Schneider, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Kenneth Kellogg on behalf of TODD BENJAMIN, TODD BENJAMIN INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. Attorney Jason Kenneth Kellogg added to party TODD BENJAMIN(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Kenneth Kellogg added to party TODD BENJAMIN INTERNATIONAL, LTD.(pty:pla). (Kellogg, Jason) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Jonathan E. Perlman of Filing Order Appointing Receiver. Attorney Heather Lauren Yonke added to party Jonathan E. Perlman(pty:rc). (Yonke, Heather) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TODD BENJAMIN, TODD BENJAMIN INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. WILLIAM FICKLING waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Cohn, Aaron) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TODD BENJAMIN, TODD BENJAMIN INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. ALYCE SCHREIBER waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Cohn, Aaron) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TODD BENJAMIN, TODD BENJAMIN INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. TARA ANTAL waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Cohn, Aaron) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TODD BENJAMIN, TODD BENJAMIN INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. ROBERT PRESS waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Cohn, Aaron) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge, referring case to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to TARA ANTAL, THOMAS DAY, WILLIAM FICKLING, ROBERT PRESS, PATRICK PRIMAVERA, ALYCE SCHREIBER, DONNA SILVERMAN, TCA Fund Management Group Corp. (pcs) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT VERIFIED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against TARA ANTAL, THOMAS DAY, WILLIAM FICKLING, ROBERT PRESS, PATRICK PRIMAVERA, ALYCE SCHREIBER, DONNA SILVERMAN, TCA Fund Management Group Corp.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12822357, filed by TODD BENJAMIN, TODD BENJAMIN INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summon(s))(Cohn, Aaron) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TCA Fund Management Group Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron Stenzler Weiss