This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2020 at 09:47:20 (UTC).

Tocci v. Saul

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Tocci filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon L. Gleason. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00202

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon L. Gleason

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Tocci

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher H. Dellert

Attorney at Dellert Baird Law Offices, PLLC

2805 S. Bridgeport Way, #23

University Place, WA 98466

Defendant Attorney

Steven E Skrocki

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Anch)

222 West 7Th Avenue, Rm 253 #9

Anchorage, AK 99513

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due w/in 60 days of initial appearance; opening brief due w/in 30 days; answering brief due w/in 30 days; reply w/in 14 days. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 9/25/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: Application to Waive File Fee at Docket #3 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court to issue summons. Defendant to file Answer/Response w/in 60 days. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 8/24/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Tocci. Andrew Saul served on 9/24/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dellert, Christopher) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #10 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due w/in 60 days of initial appearance; opening brief due w/in 30 days; answering brief due w/in 30 days; reply w/in 14 days. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 9/25/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Skrocki on behalf of Andrew Saul (Skrocki, Steven) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SLG TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Christopher Dellert, at docket #5 , is hereby GRANTED. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT - Certificate of Good Standing by Kimberly Tocci re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Christopher H. Dellert. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2926939.). (Dellert, Christopher) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: Application to Waive File Fee at Docket #3 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court to issue summons. Defendant to file Answer/Response w/in 60 days. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 8/24/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Christopher H. Dellert. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2926939.) by Kimberly Tocci. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dellert, Christopher) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unissued summons re Defendant Attorney General, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Civil Chief, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Social Security Administration)(KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kimberly Tocci.(KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Kimberly Tocci.(KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less