This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:25:33 (UTC).

TOBIAS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 TOBIAS filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Boasberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03649

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Boasberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIMMY TOBIAS

Defendants

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY

BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua Hart Burday

Attorney at LOEVY & LOEVY

311 N. Aberdeen Street, Third Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Defendant Attorneys

Brenda A. Gonzalez

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

555 Fourth St N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Damon William Taaffe

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brenda A. Gonzalez on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Damon Taaffe (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/16/2020. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/17/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY served on 12/16/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 12/16/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #24

Summons

1 #13

Exhibit M

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6626981) filed by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Civil Cover Sheet, #24 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' #10 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by March 6, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/30/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brenda A. Gonzalez on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Damon Taaffe (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/16/2020. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/17/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY served on 12/16/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 12/16/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/29/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule by January 29, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/15/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6626981) filed by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Civil Cover Sheet, #24 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less