This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2023 at 07:12:11 (UTC).

Tlaib v. Chattem, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2023 Tlaib filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Chattem, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald A. Guzman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00376

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. Guzman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mohamad Tlaib

Defendant

Chattem, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Spencer Sheehan

Francis Richard Greene

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Mohamad Tlaib; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20261721.(Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 01/22/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 01/22/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mohamad Tlaib by Spencer Sheehan (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mohamad Tlaib by Francis Richard Greene (Greene, Francis) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mohamad Tlaib by Francis Richard Greene (Greene, Francis) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Chattem, Inc. (emc, ) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (kra, ) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kra, ) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mohamad Tlaib by Spencer Sheehan (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 01/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Mohamad Tlaib; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20261721.(Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 01/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less