This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2022 at 02:36:21 (UTC).

TJM 64, Inc et al v. Administrator of the Small Business Administration et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2022 TJM 64, Inc filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Administrator of the Small Business Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark S. Norris and Annie T. Christoff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02233

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark S. Norris

Referral Judge

Annie T. Christoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TJM 64, Inc

RAB Memphis, LLC

LBOE, Inc.

Defendants

Administrator of the Small Business Administration

US Small Business Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Randall N Songstad

Attorney at THE SONGSTAD LAW FIRM

254 Court Ave., Ste. 505

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Summons by Randall N Songstad on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Songstad, Randall) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LBOE, Inc., RAB Memphis, LLC, TJM 64, Inc. (Songstad, Randall) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to US Small Business Administration. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to US Small Business Administration. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LBOE, Inc., RAB Memphis, LLC, TJM 64, Inc. (Songstad, Randall) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Summons by Randall N Songstad on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Songstad, Randall) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3854334), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Songstad, Randall) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ADMINISTRATOR SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION UNITED STATES AM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall N Songstad