This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 09:15:48 (UTC).

Titus v. Frakes

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 Titus filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Frakes. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pro Se Docket and Richard G. Kopf. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Pro Se Docket

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Kopf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shawn M. Titus

Lincoln, NE 68542-2500

Defendant

Scott Frakes

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (CS) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Shawn M. Titus. (LKO) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

10 #1

Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $125.11 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: May 29, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiffs claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and plaintiff's institution)(LKO) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#10

(#10) JUDGMENT - PRO SE regarding Memorandum and Order, #9 . This case is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is hereby notified that the filing of a notice of appeal will make him liable for payment of the full $505.00 appellate filing fee regardless of the outcome of the appeal. This is because the Prison Litigation Reform Act requires an incarcerated civil appellant to pay the full amount of the $505.00 appellate filing fee by making monthly payments to the court, even if he or she is proceeding in forma pauperis. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). By filing a notice of appeal, Plaintiff will be consenting to the deduction of the $505.00 filing fee from his prison account by prison officials. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Memorandum and Orders #7 and #8 . On the court's own motion, this matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the court's initial partial filing fee and for failure to comply with a court order. The court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#4

(#4) LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Letter sent to Bruce Hunzeker at Nebraska Department of Correctional Services. (LKO) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Scott Frakes filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Shawn M. Titus. (LKO) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff will have 30 days to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to pay the initial partial filing fee. In the absence of cause shown, this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 5, 2019: response to show-cause order due. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) JUDGMENT - PRO SE regarding Memorandum and Order, #9 . This case is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is hereby notified that the filing of a notice of appeal will make him liable for payment of the full $505.00 appellate filing fee regardless of the outcome of the appeal. This is because the Prison Litigation Reform Act requires an incarcerated civil appellant to pay the full amount of the $505.00 appellate filing fee by making monthly payments to the court, even if he or she is proceeding in forma pauperis. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). By filing a notice of appeal, Plaintiff will be consenting to the deduction of the $505.00 filing fee from his prison account by prison officials. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Memorandum and Orders #7 and #8 . On the court's own motion, this matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the court's initial partial filing fee and for failure to comply with a court order. The court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff will have 30 days to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to pay the initial partial filing fee. In the absence of cause shown, this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 5, 2019: response to show-cause order due. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $125.11 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: May 29, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiffs claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and plaintiff's institution)(LKO) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Shawn M. Titus. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (CS) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Letter sent to Bruce Hunzeker at Nebraska Department of Correctional Services. (LKO) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Shawn M. Titus. (LKO) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Scott Frakes filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Shawn M. Titus. (LKO) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.