This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2020 at 08:08:32 (UTC).

Titan Machinery Inc. v. Strait

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 Titan Machinery Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Strait. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alice R. Senechal, Peter D. Welte and Daniel M. Traynor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00026

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alice R. Senechal

Presiding Judges

Peter D. Welte

Daniel M. Traynor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Titan Machinery Inc.

Defendant

Robert Strait

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jon R. Brakke

Attorney at VOGEL LAW FIRM

218 Np Avenue, Po Box 1389

Fargo, ND 58107-1389

Defendant Attorney

Joel M. Fremstad

Attorney at Fremstad Law

3003 32Nd Avenue South, Suite 240

Fargo, ND 58103

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint and Interrogatories and Request for Production of

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 7/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. (Trial Est. 3 Days). (AS) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2021 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 1/15/2021. Discovery Motions due by 2/1/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/15/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/15/2020. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 12/15/2020. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 12/15/2020. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 2/1/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 8/15/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2020. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 8/15/2020. Nondispositive Motions due by 8/15/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/26/2021. Status Conference set for 9/15/2020 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 4/16/2020. (Court Reporter none) (td) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (LF) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Robert Strait. (Fremstad, Joel) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docket(#3) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte.(as) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER OF RECUSAL by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Chief Judge Peter D. Welte recused. (EA) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert Strait from Cass County District Court, case number not assigned. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 320000185 filed by Robert Strait. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint and Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed in Cass County District Court, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(as) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Titan Machinery, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon R. Brakke