This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2019 at 07:35:27 (UTC).

Titan Freight Systems, Inc. v. Titan Transfer, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 Titan Freight Systems, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Titan Transfer, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stacie F. Beckerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00324

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stacie F. Beckerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Titan Freight Systems, Inc.

Defendant

Titan Transfer, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Stewart Love

Attorney at Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

One World Trade Center, 121 Sw Salmon Street, Suite 1600

Portland, OR 97204

Todd M. Siegel

Attorney at Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

One World Trade Center, 121 Sw Salmon Street, Suite 1600

Portland, OR 97204

Defendant Attorney

Brenna Kristine Legaard

Attorney at Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt

1211 Sw 5Th Ave, Ste. 1600

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Titan Transfer, Inc. waiver sent on 4/2/2019. Filed by Titan Transfer, Inc.. (Legaard, Brenna) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#5

(#5) Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper. (joha) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Titan Transfer, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/3/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/2/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 8/2/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Titan Freight Systems, Inc.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#1

(#1) Complaint. for Trademark Infringement and Unfair Competition Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5760786 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Titan Freight Systems, Inc. against Titan Transfer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons). (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 7

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

1 #15

Exhibit Exhibit 15

1 #14

Exhibit Exhibit 14

1 #17

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons

1 #16

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit Exhibit 10

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Titan Transfer, Inc. waiver sent on 4/2/2019. Filed by Titan Transfer, Inc.. (Legaard, Brenna) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper. (joha) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Titan Transfer, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/3/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/2/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 8/2/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Titan Freight Systems, Inc.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint. for Trademark Infringement and Unfair Competition Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5760786 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Titan Freight Systems, Inc. against Titan Transfer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons). (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.