This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2021 at 08:46:13 (UTC).

Tireboots by Universal Canvas, Inc. v. Tiresocks, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 Tireboots by Universal Canvas, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Tiresocks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary M. Rowland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07404

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary M. Rowland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tireboots by Universal Canvas, Inc.

Defendants

Jarrett Gordon

Tiresocks, Inc.

Tiresocks International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Sabrina J. Danielson

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1900 Sixteenth Street, Suite No. 1400

Denver, CO 80202-5255

Elizabeth M. Manno

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1900 Sixteenth Street, Suite No. 1400

Denver, CO 80202-5255

Genna S Hibbs

Attorney at Hibbs Law, LLC

226 W. Judd St., Suite B, Woodstock

Mchenry, IL 60098

Jeremy L. Buxbaum

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

131 S. Dearborn St., Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60603

Thomas Lee Holt

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

131 South Dearborn Street, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MOTION by Defendants Tiresocks International, Inc., Tiresocks, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint,, #1 Agreed (Buxbaum, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

#13

(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: A notice of voluntary dismissal (Dkt. #12 ) has been filed. This case against individual defendant Jarrett Gordon is dismissed without prejudice and without costs. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

12 #1

Notice of Filing

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tireboots by Universal Canvas, Inc. of Defendant Jarrett Gordon (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Hibbs, Genna) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#8

(#8) Pro Hac Vice Appearance by Jarrett Gordon, Tiresocks International, Inc., Tiresocks, Inc. (RECEIPT # 0752-17819594) (Manno, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

1 #12

Supplement Blank Waiver forms for all three Defendants

1 #11

Notice of Filing Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service

1 #10

Attorney Appearance

1 #9

Exhibit Exbt PQRST

1 #8

Exhibit Exbt LMNO

1 #7

Exhibit Exbt JK

1 #6

Exhibit Exbt I part 2

1 #5

Exhibit Exbt I part 1

1 #4

Exhibit Exbt ABCDEFGH

1 #3

Notice of Filing Notice of Filing Complaint

1 #2

Notice of Filing Notice of Claims to Director

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Tireboots by Universal Canvas, Inc. ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17741346. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Claims to Director, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exbt ABCDEFGH, #5 Exhibit Exbt I part 1, #6 Exhibit Exbt I part 2, #7 Exhibit Exbt JK, #8 Exhibit Exbt LMNO, #9 Exhibit Exbt PQRST, #10 Attorney Appearance, #11 Notice of Filing Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service, #12 Supplement Blank Waiver forms for all three Defendants)(Hibbs, Genna) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION by Defendants Tiresocks International, Inc., Tiresocks, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint,, #1 Agreed (Buxbaum, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: A notice of voluntary dismissal (Dkt. #12 ) has been filed. This case against individual defendant Jarrett Gordon is dismissed without prejudice and without costs. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tireboots by Universal Canvas, Inc. of Defendant Jarrett Gordon (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Hibbs, Genna) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Motion to appear pro hac vice by Elizabeth M. Manno #8 is granted. Counsel is reminded to become familiar with this court's local rules (including the rules requiring local counsel and describing this court's trial bar). Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Motion to appear pro hac vice by Sabrina J. Danielson #9 is granted. Counsel is reminded to become familiar with this court's local rules (including the rules requiring local counsel and describing this court's trial bar). Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17819820. (Danielson, Sabrina) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Pro Hac Vice Appearance by Jarrett Gordon, Tiresocks International, Inc., Tiresocks, Inc. (RECEIPT # 0752-17819594) (Manno, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#7) PAYMENT by Jarrett Gordon, Tiresocks International, Inc., Tiresocks, Inc. of Pro Hac Fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17819594. (Manno, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jarrett Gordon, Tiresocks International, Inc., Tiresocks, Inc. by Jeremy L. Buxbaum (Buxbaum, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jarrett Gordon, Tiresocks International, Inc., Tiresocks, Inc. by Thomas Lee Holt (Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 3/1/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tireboots by Universal Canvas, Inc. by Genna S Hibbs (Hibbs, Genna) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hibbs, Genna) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Tireboots by Universal Canvas, Inc. ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17741346. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Claims to Director, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exbt ABCDEFGH, #5 Exhibit Exbt I part 1, #6 Exhibit Exbt I part 2, #7 Exhibit Exbt JK, #8 Exhibit Exbt LMNO, #9 Exhibit Exbt PQRST, #10 Attorney Appearance, #11 Notice of Filing Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service, #12 Supplement Blank Waiver forms for all three Defendants)(Hibbs, Genna) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sabrina J. Danielson