This case was last updated from PACER on 12/05/2019 at 05:51:09 (UTC).

Tirado v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability case was filed by Tirado against Sanofi US Services Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14045

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sara Tirado

Defendants

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Christopher Elliott

Attorney at Bachus & Schanker, LLC (Denver)

1899 Wynkoop Street, Suite 700

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) First AMENDED COMPLAINT by Sara Tirado. (Elliott, John) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#4

(#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(caa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8007095) filed by Sara Tirado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney John Christopher Elliott added to party Sara Tirado(pty:pla).(Elliott, John) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First AMENDED COMPLAINT by Sara Tirado. (Elliott, John) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(caa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8007095) filed by Sara Tirado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney John Christopher Elliott added to party Sara Tirado(pty:pla).(Elliott, John) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.