This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/26/2022 at 08:18:05 (UTC).

Tipton v. Nabors Drilling USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 Tipton filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Nabors Drilling USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel M. Traynor and Clare R. Hochhalter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00036

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel M. Traynor

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kody Tipton

Defendants

Nabors Drilling USA, Inc.

Nabors Drilling USA LP

Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc.

Oasis Petroleum Inc.

Oasis Petroleum LLC

Oasis Petroleum North America LLC

Oasis Petroleum Marketing, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David D. Schweigert

Attorney at Schweigert, Klemin & McBride, P.C.

116 N. 2Nd Street, Po Box 955

Bismarck, ND 58502

Cody Nichols

Attorney at Schweigert, Klemin & McBride PC

116 North 2Nd Street

Bismarck, ND 58502

Defendant Attorneys

Paul Jonathan Forster

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP (Bismarck)

100 West Broadway, Suite 250, P.O. Box 2798

Bismarck, ND 58502-2798

Benjamin J. Sand

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP (Bismarck)

100 West Broadway, Suite 250, P.O. Box 2798

Bismarck, ND 58502-2798

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Oasis Petroleum Inc., Oasis Petroleum LLC, Oasis Petroleum Marketing, LLC, Oasis Petroleum North America LLC from Wlliams County Court, case number None Assigned. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 122000429 filed by Oasis Petroleum Inc., Oasis Petroleum LLC, Oasis Petroleum Marketing, LLC, Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Summons (State Court), #3 Exhibit 2 - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial (State Court), #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (State Court), #5 4 - Certificate of Service (State Court))(mf) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Summons (State Court)

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial (State Court)

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (State Court)

1 #5

4 - Certificate of Service (State Court)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc., Nabors Drilling USA LP, Nabors Drilling USA, Inc.. (mf) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oasis Petroleum Inc., Oasis Petroleum LLC, Oasis Petroleum Marketing, LLC, Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Sand, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oasis Petroleum Inc., Oasis Petroleum LLC, Oasis Petroleum Marketing, LLC, Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Sand, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Oasis Petroleum Inc., Oasis Petroleum LLC, Oasis Petroleum Marketing, LLC, Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Sand, Benjamin) Modified on 3/17/2022 to correct motion relief (mf) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Oasis Petroleum Inc., Oasis Petroleum LLC, Oasis Petroleum Marketing, LLC, Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Sand, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc., Nabors Drilling USA LP, Nabors Drilling USA, Inc.. (Sand, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/10/2022 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/10/2022 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc., Nabors Drilling USA LP, Nabors Drilling USA, Inc.. (Sand, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Oasis Petroleum Inc., Oasis Petroleum LLC, Oasis Petroleum Marketing, LLC, Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Sand, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have until 4/06/2022 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. (BG) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Clerk's Office corrected motion relief from Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (mf) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Oasis Petroleum Inc., Oasis Petroleum LLC, Oasis Petroleum Marketing, LLC, Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Sand, Benjamin) Modified on 3/17/2022 to correct motion relief (mf) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oasis Petroleum Inc., Oasis Petroleum LLC, Oasis Petroleum Marketing, LLC, Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Sand, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oasis Petroleum Inc., Oasis Petroleum LLC, Oasis Petroleum Marketing, LLC, Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Sand, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc., Nabors Drilling USA LP, Nabors Drilling USA, Inc.. (mf) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Oasis Petroleum Inc., Oasis Petroleum LLC, Oasis Petroleum Marketing, LLC, Oasis Petroleum North America LLC from Wlliams County Court, case number None Assigned. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 122000429 filed by Oasis Petroleum Inc., Oasis Petroleum LLC, Oasis Petroleum Marketing, LLC, Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Summons (State Court), #3 Exhibit 2 - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial (State Court), #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (State Court), #5 4 - Certificate of Service (State Court))(mf) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oasis Petroleum North America LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Nabors Drilling U S A L P is a litigant