This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/27/2020 at 09:39:12 (UTC).

Tiny's Construction, LLC v. Ecoverse Industries, Ltd

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 Tiny's Construction, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ecoverse Industries, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alistair Newbern and William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00737

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tiny's Construction, LLC

Defendant

Ecoverse Industries, Ltd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jean Dyer Harrison

Attorney at Harrison Law Group, P.C.

615 Main Street, Suite M-10

Nashville, TN 37206

Defendant Attorneys

J. Britt Phillips

Attorney at Sutter O'Connell, Co.

5200 Maryland Way, Suite 350

Brentwood, TN 37027

Denise A. Dickerson

Attorney at Sutter, O'Connell & Farchione Co., LPA

1301 E 9Th Street, 3600 Erieview Tower

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#14

13 #1

Attachment Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Remand

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1-Complaint

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of Case transferred from Tennessee Middle has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:20-cv-02349, filed 10/15/2020. (bs) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket***This action has been transferred to the Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division.*** (mg) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER TO NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this case be transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division; and that Ecoverse be granted fourteen (14) days to file its answer following transfer. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/13/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint MOTION Transfer to Northern District of Ohio re #5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to Mandatory Forum Selection Clause by Ecoverse Industries, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Remand)(Dickerson, Denise) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply for an additional thirty (30) days. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/15/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to Mandatory Forum Selection Clause, #10 Order,, by Tiny's Construction, LLC. (Harrison, Jean) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: The parties have filed an "agreed order to extend time for Plaintiff to file response to motion to dismiss or transfer." (Doc. No. #9 .) This is a matter for the Court's decision and requires the filing of a motion seeking the desired relief. If there is no opposition to the requested relief, the parties may file a joint motion or state that the motion is unopposed. No extension will be granted unless a motion is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/10/2020. (mg) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION - Agreed Order to Extend Time for Plaintiff to File Response to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer by Ecoverse Industries, Ltd. (Dickerson, Denise) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: On August 31, 2020, Defendant Ecoverse Industries, Ltd. ("Ecoverse") filed a motion to dismiss or change venue under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (Doc. No. #5 .) Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Campbell unless referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/1/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tiny's Construction, LLC. (Harrison, Jean) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/31/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to Mandatory Forum Selection Clause by Ecoverse Industries, Ltd. (Phillips, J.) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (vh) (Entered: 08/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for J. Britt Phillips, Denise A. Dickerson, and Jean Dyer Harrison. (vh) (Entered: 08/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh) (Entered: 08/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh) (Entered: 08/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ecoverse Industries, Ltd from Chancery Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 20-0674-II. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3204797) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh) (Entered: 08/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ECOVERSE INDUSTRIES LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J Britt Phillips

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Denise A. Dickerson Esq.