This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2022 at 07:15:12 (UTC).

Tinner v. Boehringer Ingelheim et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2022 Tinner filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robin L. Rosenberg and Bruce E. Reinhart. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-CV-81079

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Dawn Tinner

Defendants

Wal-Mart, Inc.

Sam's West, Inc

Boehringer Ingelheim

GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC;

Sanofi US Servces Inc.

Sanofi Aventis U.S. LLC

Patheon Manufacturing Services, LLC (Collectively "Sanofi")

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

Cardinal Health, Inc.

CHATTEM, INC.

McKesson Corporation

Apotex Corp

Apotex Inc.

Auro Health LLC

Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. (India)

Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.

Dr. Reddy's Laboratories SA (Switzerland)

Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.

Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. (India)

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles D. Hancock

Attorney at Hancock Law Firm

610 E. 6Th Street

Littlerock, AR 72202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#3) ORDER of Consolidation and Administrative Close-Out. Closing Case. All pending motions are hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the movant to comply with the procedures outlined in Pretrial Order # 24, paragraph 10. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER of Consolidation and Administrative Close-Out. Closing Case. All pending motions are hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the movant to comply with the procedures outlined in Pretrial Order # 24, paragraph 10. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCases associated Re: 20-md-2924-RLR. (pes) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2022
  • Docket(#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart (swr) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15814496, filed by Kimberly Dawn Tinner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hancock, Charles) (Entered: 07/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auro Health, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sam's West, Inc. is a litigant