This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/21/2020 at 09:18:59 (UTC).

Tingle v. St. Clair County, Alabama et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 Tingle filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against St Clair County, Alabama. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Corey L Maze. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00231

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Corey L Maze

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason B Tingle

Defendants

Pell City, Alabama

Terry Surles

QCHC, Inc.

St. Clair County, Alabama

Billy Murray

Greg Watson

Paul Monk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gayle L Douglas

Attorney at HENINGER GARRISON DAVIS LLC

P.O. Box 11310

Birmingham, AL 35202

Mark Randall Ekonen

Attorney at HENINGER GARRISON DAVIS LLC

2224 First Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

James W Porter, II

Attorney at PORTER PORTER & HASSINGER PC

880 Montclair Road, Suite 175

Birmingham, AL 35213

Richard Warren Kinney, III

Attorney at PORTER PORTER & HASSINGER PC

880 Montclair Road, Suite 175

Birmingham, AL 35213

Fred Lee Clements, Jr

Attorney at WEBB & ELEY PC

7475 Halcyon Pointe Drive, P O Box 240909

Montgomery, AL 36124

J Randall McNeill

Attorney at WEBB & ELEY PC

7475 Halcyon Pointe Drive, Po Box 240909

Montgomery, AL 36124

LaBella S Alvis

Attorney at CHRISTIAN & SMALL LLP

1800 Financial Center, 505 North 20Th Street, Suite 1800

Birmingham, AL 35203-2696

Mickey Jansen Voss

Attorney at CHRISTIAN & SMALL LLP

505 North 20Th Street, Suite 1800

Birmingham, AL 35203-2696

Jordan Cherry Loper

Attorney at CHRISTIAN & SMALL, LLP

505 20Th Street North, Ste. 1800

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#24

#22

#21

#20

#18

#17

#16

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER Plaintiff is ORDERED to file his amended complaint no later than April 24, 2020. The Defendants are ORDERED to file their responsive pleadings no later than May 22, 2020. This case is also set for an additional telephone conference on May 26, 2020 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 4/7/2020. (SRD) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Corey L. Maze: Telephone Conference held on 4/7/2020. (SRD) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Mickey Jansen Voss on behalf of QCHC, Inc. (Voss, Mickey) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Cherry Loper on behalf of QCHC, Inc. (Loper, Jordan) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) TEXT ORDER GRANTING Defendant QCHC Inc.'s Supplemental Motion for Extension of Time for Brief Deadline of March 30, 2020 (doc. #18 ). Accordingly, the court find that Defendant QCHC Inc.'s original Motion for Extension of Time (doc. #17 ) is moot and accepts the brief as filed on March 30, 2020 (doc. #21 ). The telephone conference set for April 7, 2020 will continue as scheduled. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 4/3/2020. (SRD) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by J Randall McNeill on behalf of Paul Monk, Billy Murray, St. Clair County, Alabama, Terry Surles, Greg Watson (McNeill, J) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Brief re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Request Plaintiff to Amend Complaint . (Voss, Mickey) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by James W Porter, II on behalf of Pell City, Alabama (Porter, James) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Randall Ekonen on behalf of Jason B Tingle (Ekonen, Mark) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Extension of Time Supplemental Motion for Brief Deadline of March 30, 2020 by QCHC, Inc.. (Alvis, LaBella) (Entered: 03/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS- with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 3/17/2020. (SRD) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Brief re #7 MOTION to Dismiss . (Clements, Fred) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by St. Clair County, Alabama. (Clements, Fred) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason B Tingle. Pell City, Alabama served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020 (green card not dated). (AKD) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed QCHC, Inc. served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020; Greg Watson served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (MRR, ) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason B Tingle. Paul Monk served on 2/28/2020 (, answer due 3/20/2020 (green card not dated); Billy Murray served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020 (green card not dated); St. Clair County, Alabama served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020; Terry Surles served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (AKD) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Paul Monk, Billy Murray, Pell City, Alabama, QCHC, Inc., St. Clair County, Alabama, Terry Surles, Greg Watson mailed certified mail. (AKD) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Jason B Tingle. (Douglas, Gayle) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3541542 (ALND receipt# B4601104252). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jason B Tingle.(SRD). (Douglas, Gayle) Modified on 2/24/2020 (AKD) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jason B Tingle.(SRD) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QCHC, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gayle L Douglas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark R. Ekonen