This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:27:54 (UTC).

Tine Bak LLC v. Prater 5 Media LLC

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Tine Bak LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Prater 5 Media LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barbara D. Holmes and William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00094

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tine Bak LLC

Defendant

Prater 5 Media LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nancy J. Mertzel

Attorney at Mertzel Law PLLC

5 Penn Plaza, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

Timothy L. Warnock

Attorney at Riley, Warnock & Jacobson

1906 West End Avenue

Nashville, TN 37203

Keane A. Barger

Attorney at Riley, Warnock & Jacobson

1906 West End Avenue

Nashville, TN 37203

Defendant Attorney

Samuel J. Blanton

Attorney at Tune, Entrekin & White, P.C.

315 Deaderick Street, Suite 1700

Nashville, TN 37238

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Prater 5 Media LLC answer due 2/7/2020. The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from February 7, 2020, to 2:00 p.m, Friday, March 13, 2020, in the 2nd Floor Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, 815 South Garden Street, Columbia, Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/24/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

#7

(#7) MOTION for attorney Nancy J. Mertzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3058337) by Tine Bak LLC. (Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) DECLARATION of Nancy J. Mertzel filed by Tine Bak LLC re: #7 MOTION for attorney Nancy J. Mertzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3058337). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#13

(#13) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tine Bak LLC. (Barger, Keane) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference by Prater 5 Media LLC. (Blanton, Samuel) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons issued as to Prater 5 Media LLC. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.) (dt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#12

(#12) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Prater 5 Media LLC. (Blanton, Samuel) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Nancy J. Mertzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/3/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS returned executed by Tine Bak LLC. Prater 5 Media LLC served on 1/3/2020. (Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Prater 5 Media LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3044657), filed by Tine Bak LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) Modified on 12/6/2019 (dt). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 11:00 AM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt) Modified on 12/6/2019 (dt). (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/6/2019) (dt). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketReset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2020 at 02:00 PM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (hb) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Prater 5 Media LLC answer due 2/7/2020. The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from February 7, 2020, to 2:00 p.m, Friday, March 13, 2020, in the 2nd Floor Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, 815 South Garden Street, Columbia, Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/24/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tine Bak LLC. (Barger, Keane) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Prater 5 Media LLC. (Blanton, Samuel) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference by Prater 5 Media LLC. (Blanton, Samuel) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS returned executed by Tine Bak LLC. Prater 5 Media LLC served on 1/3/2020. (Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Nancy J. Mertzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/3/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLARATION of Nancy J. Mertzel filed by Tine Bak LLC re: #7 MOTION for attorney Nancy J. Mertzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3058337). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for attorney Nancy J. Mertzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3058337) by Tine Bak LLC. (Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 11:00 AM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt) Modified on 12/6/2019 (dt). (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/6/2019) (dt). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons issued as to Prater 5 Media LLC. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.) (dt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Nancy J. Mertzel: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/27/2019. (dt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Timothy L. Warnock. NY State Bar status verified as active for Nancy J. Mertzel. (dt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Prater 5 Media LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3044657), filed by Tine Bak LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) Modified on 12/6/2019 (dt). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.