This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/06/2022 at 07:07:16 (UTC).

Tina Jaggers v. Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2022 Tina Jaggers filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Pym and Jesus G. Bernal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00784

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tina Jaggers

Petitioner

Corona Regional Medical Center

Defendants

Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.

Universal Health Services of Palmdale, Inc. doing business as Corona Regional Medical Center

Medical Data Systems Inc. doing business as Medical Revenue Service Inc

Fresno Credit Bureau doing business as Creditors Bureau USA

Radavantage, A Professional Corporation

Gulf Coast Collection Bureau, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Youssef Hussein Hammoud

Attorney at Hammoud Law PC

3744 East Chapman Avenue No F12269

Orange, CA 92859

Defendant and Petitioner Attorneys

Stephen H Turner

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Calvin Williams Davis

Attorney at Carlson and Messer LLP

5901 West Century Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90045

David J Kaminski

Attorney at Carlson and Messer LLP

5901 West Century Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Katherine S Catlos

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich and Voluck LLP

425 California Street Suite 2100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Marcus M Dong

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich and Voluck LLP

425 California Street Suite 2100

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (tc) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#41

(#41) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Medical Data Systems Inc., identifying Tina Jaggers; Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.; Universal Health Services of Palmdale, Inc. D/B/A Corona Regional Medical Center; Medical Data Systems Inc. d/b/a Medical Revenue Service; Fresno Credit Bureau d/b/a Creditors Bureau USA; Radavantage, A Professional Corporation; and Gulf Coast Collection Bureau, Inc.. (Kaminski, David) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#40

(#40) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Medical Data Systems Inc..(Kaminski, David) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#39

(#39) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. answer now due 6/23/2022; Corona Regional Medical Center answer now due 6/23/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. ; Corona Regional Medical Center.(Attorney Stephen H Turner added to party Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Stephen H Turner added to party Corona Regional Medical Center(pty:bkmov))(Turner, Stephen) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#38

(#38) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Medical Data Systems Inc. answer now due 6/23/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Medical Data Systems Inc..(Attorney David J Kaminski added to party Medical Data Systems Inc.(pty:dft))(Kaminski, David) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#37

(#37) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers, upon Defendant Radavantage, A Professional Corporation served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Koy Saechao, Authorized Agent to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#36

(#36) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers, upon Defendant Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Koy Saechao, Authorized Agent to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#35

(#35) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers, upon Defendant Medical Data Systems Inc. served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Koy Saechao, Authorized Agent to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#34

(#34) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Gulf Coast Collection Bureau, Inc., (Dong, Marcus) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#9

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers, (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

#1

(#33) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Gulf Coast Collection Bureau, Inc..(Attorney Marcus M Dong added to party Gulf Coast Collection Bureau, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dong, Marcus) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (tc) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Medical Data Systems Inc., identifying Tina Jaggers; Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.; Universal Health Services of Palmdale, Inc. D/B/A Corona Regional Medical Center; Medical Data Systems Inc. d/b/a Medical Revenue Service; Fresno Credit Bureau d/b/a Creditors Bureau USA; Radavantage, A Professional Corporation; and Gulf Coast Collection Bureau, Inc.. (Kaminski, David) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Medical Data Systems Inc..(Kaminski, David) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. answer now due 6/23/2022; Corona Regional Medical Center answer now due 6/23/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. ; Corona Regional Medical Center.(Attorney Stephen H Turner added to party Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Stephen H Turner added to party Corona Regional Medical Center(pty:bkmov))(Turner, Stephen) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Medical Data Systems Inc. answer now due 6/23/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Medical Data Systems Inc..(Attorney David J Kaminski added to party Medical Data Systems Inc.(pty:dft))(Kaminski, David) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers, upon Defendant Radavantage, A Professional Corporation served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Koy Saechao, Authorized Agent to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers, upon Defendant Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Koy Saechao, Authorized Agent to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers, upon Defendant Medical Data Systems Inc. served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Koy Saechao, Authorized Agent to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Gulf Coast Collection Bureau, Inc., (Dong, Marcus) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Gulf Coast Collection Bureau, Inc..(Attorney Marcus M Dong added to party Gulf Coast Collection Bureau, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dong, Marcus) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers, (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33258361 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Tina Jaggers. (Attorney Youssef Hussein Hammoud added to party Tina Jaggers(pty:pla))(Hammoud, Youssef) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medical Data Systems, Inc. doing business as Medical Revenue Service is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF PALMDALE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CORONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where GULF COAST COLLECTION BUREAU INC is a litigant