This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2019 at 07:38:39 (UTC).

Timmins Software Corporation v. EMC Corporation, et al.

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 Timmins Software Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against EMC Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Indira Talwani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12053

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Indira Talwani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timmins Software Corporation

Defendants

EMC Corporation,

Dell Inc.

Dell Technologies Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin M. Stern

Attorney at Verrill Dana, LLP

One Federal Street, 20Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

Defendant Attorneys

Kurt Wm. Hemr

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

500 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02116

Anthony P Sammi

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Christopher G. Clark

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

500 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02116

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation, Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7907505 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by TIMMINS SOFTWARE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Local Category Form) (Stern, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Local Category Form

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

#20

(#20) Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation,.(Hemr, Kurt) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to December 13, 2019 to To Respond To Amended Complaint (Unopposed) by Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation,.(Hemr, Kurt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

16 #1

Exhibit 1 (Certification of Anthony P. Sammi)

#16

(#16) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anthony P. Sammi Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7956875 by Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Certification of Anthony P. Sammi))(Hemr, Kurt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#15

(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EMC Corporation,. (Hemr, Kurt) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dell Inc.. (Hemr, Kurt) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dell Technologies Inc.. (Hemr, Kurt) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Clark on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation, (Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion to Continue. Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/19 RESET for 1/16/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation,.(Hemr, Kurt) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to December 13, 2019 to To Respond To Amended Complaint. Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/19/RESET for 12/16/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Anthony P. Sammi. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to December 13, 2019 to To Respond To Amended Complaint (Unopposed) by Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation,.(Hemr, Kurt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anthony P. Sammi Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7956875 by Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Certification of Anthony P. Sammi))(Hemr, Kurt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EMC Corporation,. (Hemr, Kurt) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dell Inc.. (Hemr, Kurt) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dell Technologies Inc.. (Hemr, Kurt) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Clark on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation, (Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) is responsible for ensuring that all parties and/or their attorneys who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the date of the scheduling conference. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed Dell Technologies Inc. served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Stern, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed Dell Inc. served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Stern, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed EMC Corporation, served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Stern, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Stern, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Timmins Software Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Stern, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically shall download this summons, complete one for each defendant, and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DeMaria, Timothy) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TIMMINS SOFTWARE CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent TIMMINS SOFTWARE CORPORATION for TIMMINS SOFTWARE CORPORATION.. (Stern, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation, Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7907505 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by TIMMINS SOFTWARE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Local Category Form) (Stern, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.