This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2022 at 09:51:00 (UTC).

Times Square Associates, Inc. v. Blackboard Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 Times Square Associates, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Blackboard Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are James S. Moody, Jr and Philip R. Lammens. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00052

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James S. Moody, Jr

Referral Judge

Philip R. Lammens

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Times Square Associates, Inc.

Defendant

Blackboard Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Scott Constable

Attorney at Constable Law, P.A.

323 Main Street

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Defendant Attorney

Eugene P. Murphy

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

777 Brickell Avenue, Suite 680

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial Circuit, case number 2021-CA-000830 filed in State Court on 12/13/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19169677 filed by Blackboard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Eugene) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

1 #1

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #2

State Court COMPLAINT

1 #3

State Court Other Documents

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Blackboard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, Eugene) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Blackboard Insurance Company Notice of Pendency of Related Actions (Murphy, Eugene) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Blackboard Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Blackboard US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Joseph Piscopio, Other Affiliate James W Morton, Other Affiliate Karen Mortion for Blackboard Insurance Company. (Murphy, Eugene) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Blackboard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy)(Murphy, Eugene) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

9 #1

Exhibit Policy

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Times Square Associates, Inc.. (Constable, James) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#11

(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Freeman, Allison) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketSet/reset scheduling order deadlines: Joinder of Parties due by 5/4/2022,Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 11/10/2022, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 10/7/2022. (RLK) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/9/2023; Dispositive motions due by 8/11/2023; Pretrial Conference set for THURSDAY, JANUARY 11, 2024, at 9:15 AM in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody, Jr. Jury Trial set on the FEBRUARY 2024 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody, Jr. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/11/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/7/2022. (KAC) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Times Square Associates, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Constable, James) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Freeman, Allison) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Times Square Associates, Inc.. (Constable, James) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Blackboard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy)(Murphy, Eugene) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Blackboard Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Blackboard US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Joseph Piscopio, Other Affiliate James W Morton, Other Affiliate Karen Mortion for Blackboard Insurance Company. (Murphy, Eugene) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Blackboard Insurance Company Notice of Pendency of Related Actions (Murphy, Eugene) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to February 17, 2022. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/1/2022. (SMB) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Blackboard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, Eugene) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:22-cv-00052-JSM-PRL. (APV) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial Circuit, case number 2021-CA-000830 filed in State Court on 12/13/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19169677 filed by Blackboard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Eugene) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EUGENE P MURPHY