This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2021 at 08:26:26 (UTC).

Time Plumbing, Heating, & Electric, Inc v. Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 Time Plumbing, Heating, Electric, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Payless Rooter Mato Plumbing. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01242

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Time Plumbing, Heating, & Electric, Inc

Defendants

Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing

Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing, LLC

303 Plumbing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kimberly M. Hult

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants to the Complaint and Request to Re-Set the Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Time Plumbing, Heating, & Electric, Inc. (Hult, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Time Plumbing, Heating, & Electric, Inc. 303 Plumbing waiver sent on 5/14/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. (Hult, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Time Plumbing, Heating, & Electric, Inc. Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing, LLC waiver sent on 5/14/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. (Hult, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Time Plumbing, Heating, & Electric, Inc. Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing waiver sent on 5/14/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. (Hult, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#7

(#7) AMENDED ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/21/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 7/7/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/14/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/7/2021. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

4 #3

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#2

(#2) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (alave, ) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

1 #5

Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #4

Summons Summons in Civil Action to 303 Plumbing

1 #3

Summons Summons in Civil Action to Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing, LLC

1 #2

Summons Summons in Civil Action to Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 303 Plumbing, Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing, Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7853631)Attorney Kimberly M. Hult added to party Time Plumbing, Heating, & Electric, Inc(pty:pla), filed by Time Plumbing, Heating, & Electric, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing, #3 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing, LLC, #4 Summons Summons in Civil Action to 303 Plumbing, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Hult, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for an Extension of Time for Defendants to File a Response to the Complaint and Request to Re-Set the Scheduling Conference. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the operative complaint is extended until 7/27/2021. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2021 10:45 AM is VACATED and RESET for 8/25/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order on or before 8/18/2021, and shall file the consent/non-consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction form on or before 8/11/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/02/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, ) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants to the Complaint and Request to Re-Set the Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Time Plumbing, Heating, & Electric, Inc. (Hult, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Time Plumbing, Heating, & Electric, Inc. 303 Plumbing waiver sent on 5/14/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. (Hult, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Time Plumbing, Heating, & Electric, Inc. Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing, LLC waiver sent on 5/14/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. (Hult, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Time Plumbing, Heating, & Electric, Inc. Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing waiver sent on 5/14/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. (Hult, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/21/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 7/7/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/14/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/7/2021. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER #5 Order Setting Scheduling Conference was entered in error and is hereby VACATED. The Court will issue an amended order resetting the Scheduling Conference and associated deadlines. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/07/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, ) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/17/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 7/3/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/10/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/7/2021. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (alave, ) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 303 Plumbing, Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing, Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7853631)Attorney Kimberly M. Hult added to party Time Plumbing, Heating, & Electric, Inc(pty:pla), filed by Time Plumbing, Heating, & Electric, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing, #3 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Payless Rooter & Mato Plumbing, LLC, #4 Summons Summons in Civil Action to 303 Plumbing, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Hult, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less