This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2021 at 08:19:41 (UTC).

Tima v. JMAC Distribution, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 Tima filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against JMAC Distribution, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patti B. Saris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-11502

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patti B. Saris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeannine Tima

Defendants

JMAC Distribution, LLC

Primeritus Financial Services, Inc.

Ally Financial

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin V.K. Crick

Attorney at Rights Protection Law Group, PLLC

100 Cambridge St., Suite 1400

Boston, MA 02114

Yitzchak Zelman

Attorney at Marcus & Zelman, LLC

701 Cookman Avenue, Suite 300

Asbury Park, NJ 07712

Defendant Attorney

Rene M. Pickett

Attorney at Melick & Porter, LLP

One Liberty Square, 7Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Category Form

#3

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Affidavit

4 #2

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Primeritus Financial Services, Inc. served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed Ally Financial served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed JMAC Distribution, LLC served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Primeritus Financial Services, Inc..(Pickett, Rene) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand And Affirmative Defenses by JMAC Distribution, LLC.(Pickett, Rene) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand And Affirmative Defenses by Ally Financial.(Pickett, Rene) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/30/2021 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by VIDEO CONFERENCE. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/30/2021 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by VIDEO CONFERENCE. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand And Affirmative Defenses by Ally Financial.(Pickett, Rene) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand And Affirmative Defenses by JMAC Distribution, LLC.(Pickett, Rene) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Primeritus Financial Services, Inc..(Pickett, Rene) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed JMAC Distribution, LLC served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed Ally Financial served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Primeritus Financial Services, Inc. served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Yitzchak Zelman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Yitzchak Zelman, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8950089 by Jeannine Tima. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Crick, Kevin) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Ally Financial, JMAC Distribution, LLC, Primeritus Financial Services, Inc. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ally Financial, Primeritus Financial Services, Inc., JMAC Distribution, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8945426 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jeannine Tima. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Crick, Kevin) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JMAC Distribution LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rene M. Pickett