Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/27/2019 at 07:29:46 (UTC).

Tillman v. Saul

Case Summary

On 07/29/2019 Tillman filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John T. Rodgers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00263

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John T. Rodgers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Sean Tillman

Defendant

Andrew M Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dana Chris Madsen

Attorney at Law Office of Dana C Madsen

301 W Indiana Avenue, P O Box 2157

Spokane, WA 99210-2157

Defendant Attorney

Timothy Michael Durkin

Attorney at U S Attorney's Office - SPO

920 W Riverside Suite 300, P O Box 1494

Spokane, WA 99210-1494

 

Court Documents

#8

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (JW, ECF Admin) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Sean Tillman re Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Madsen, Dana) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (JW, ECF Admin) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • (#5) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 8/8/2019 (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Charles Sean Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Madsen, Dana) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Michael Durkin