This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 09:47:05

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Tillman against Roddam in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 2:19-CV-00749
  • Filing Date 05/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Prisoner - Civil Right
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Karon O Bowdre
  • Courthouse Alabama Northern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Doctor Roddam
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Nathan Tillman
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Defendant Doctor Butler
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER that the Court having received the Plaintiff's si...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) NOTICE of signed Prisoner Consent Form by Nathan Tillma...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma ...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Nathan...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Doctor Butler, Doctor Roddam, filed b...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • (#5) ORDER that the Court having received the Plaintiff's signed #4 Prisoner Consent Form, the Warden is hereby directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of Nathan Tillman until the full Filing Fee has been withheld and paid to the Clerk of the Court to satisfy the docket fee required by the filing of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/3/2019. (JLC) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
  • 05/29/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE of signed Prisoner Consent Form by Nathan Tillman. (JLC) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
  • 05/21/2019
  • (#3) ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court concludes that Plaintiff is not capable of paying an Initial Partial Filing Fee. However, if he wishes to proceeds with this action, Plaintiff shall remain obligated to pay the full filing fee to be deducted from his prison or jail trust account. Plaintiff is also required to sign and return the attached Prisoner Consent Form within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order or the complaint will be dismissed WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/21/2019. (JLC) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Nathan Tillman. (JLC) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Doctor Butler, Doctor Roddam, filed by Nathan Tillman.(JLC) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.