Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2019 at 07:46:47 (UTC).

Tillman v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 Tillman filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Halil S. Ozerden and John C. Gargiulo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00722

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Halil S. Ozerden

Referral Judge

John C. Gargiulo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yvonne Marie Tillman

Defendants

BP America Production Company

BP Exploration & Production Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Howard L. Nations - PHV

Attorney at THE NATIONS LAW FIRM

3131 Briarpark Drive, Suite 208

Houston, TX 77042

Shantrell H. Nicks

Attorney at SHANTRELL H. NICKS, ATTORNEY

2108 23Rd Avenue

Gulfport, MS 39507

Albertus F. Wiesedeppe - PHV, III

Attorney at THE NATIONS LAW FIRM

9703 Richmond Avenue, Suite 200

Houston, TX 77042

Defendant Attorneys

Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley and Anderson LLC

1201 North Market Street, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP (Houston)

600 Travis, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Don Keller *Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St., N. W.

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Clare Smith Millette

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Edderek Linnel Cole

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St., N. W.

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley and Anderson LLC

1201 North Market Street, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Scott C. Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Thomas W. Tardy, III

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Charles (Chan) E. McLeod

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Don Keller Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Georgia Lee Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP (Houston)

600 Travis, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Certificate of Good Standing for Albertus F. Wiesedeppe, III

#18

(#18) MOTION for Albertus F. Wiesedeppe, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4140351) by Yvonne Marie Tillman (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Albertus F. Wiesedeppe, III)(Nicks, Shantrell) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

17 #2

04/22/2019 Gargiulo Order

17 #1

Certificate of Good Standing for Howard L. Nations

#17

(#17) MOTION for Howard L. Nations to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4140347) by Yvonne Marie Tillman (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Howard L. Nations, #2 04/22/2019 Gargiulo Order)(Nicks, Shantrell) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#16

(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Exploration & Production Inc.. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#15

(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Production Company. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#14

(#14) Letter sent to Nations on 11/8/19 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (RLW) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Certain Counsel of Record by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#6

(#6) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/15/2019.] (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than September 4, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than October 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/5/2019.(clw) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/15/2019.] (Entered: 05/03/2019)

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(mp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/09/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/15/2019.] (Entered: 05/03/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Howard L. Nations; granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Albertus F. Wiesedeppe, III. Howard L. Nations and Albertus F. Wiesedeppe, III are admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/22/2019 (AB) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Albertus F. Wiesedeppe, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4140351) by Yvonne Marie Tillman (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Albertus F. Wiesedeppe, III)(Nicks, Shantrell) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Howard L. Nations to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4140347) by Yvonne Marie Tillman (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Howard L. Nations, #2 04/22/2019 Gargiulo Order)(Nicks, Shantrell) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Exploration & Production Inc.. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Production Company. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Letter sent to Nations on 11/8/19 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (RLW) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw Certain Counsel of Record. Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don Keller Haycraft, Devin C. Reid, Scott C. Seiler, and Georgia Lee Lucier are terminated as counsel of record for the Defendants. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/6/2019 (AG) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Certain Counsel of Record by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Edderek Linnel Cole on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Cole, Edderek) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Smith Rush on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Rush, Clare) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles (Chan) E. McLeod on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan)) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tardy, III on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-08118. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case transferred to Southern District of Mississippi. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 10/11/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/15/2019.] (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/15/2019.] (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than September 4, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than October 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/5/2019.(clw) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/15/2019.] (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(mp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7539985) filed by Yvonne Marie Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Yvonne Marie Tillman(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard)[Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edderek Linnel Cole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY