This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/19/2022 at 08:16:46 (UTC).

Tillinghast v. Makita U.S.A., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Tillinghast filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Makita U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas P. Woodlock. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-10783

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas P. Woodlock

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Tillinghast

Danvers, MA 01923

Defendants

Makita U.S.A., Inc.

Makita Corporation of America

Makita Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard J. Sullivan

Attorney at Sullivan & Sullivan, LLP

83 Walnut Street, Suite 100

Wellesley, MA 02481

James M. McLaughlin

Attorney at Sullivan & Sullivan, LLP

83 Walnut Street, Suite 100

Wellesley, MA 02481

Defendant Attorney

Anthony V. Agudelo

Attorney at Sugarman, Rogers, Barshak & Cohen, P.C.

101 Merrimac Street, 9Th Floor

Boston, MA 02114

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony V. Agudelo on behalf of Makita Corporation of America, Makita U.S.A., Inc. (Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Makita U.S.A., Inc..(Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Makita Corporation of America.(Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#7

(#7) STATE COURT Record Makita Corporation of America summons served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; Makita U.S.A., Inc. summons served on 5/9/2022, answer due 5/31/2022.. (Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceThis hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2022 02:20 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Makita Corporation of America identifying Other Affiliate Makita U.S.A., Inc. for Makita Corporation of America.. (Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Makita U.S.A., Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Makita Corporation of America for Makita U.S.A., Inc... (Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by James M. McLaughlin on behalf of Michael Tillinghast (McLaughlin, James) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#12

(#12) Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Michael Tillinghast.(McLaughlin, James) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed (McLaughlin, James) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#14

(#14) JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference Pursuant to Rule 16.1. (Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#15

(#15) Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: SCHEDULING ORDER - All fact discovery to be completed by 3/31/2023; Expert disclosure under Rule 26 to be provided by the plaintiff no later than 4/28/2023, and by the defendants no later than 7/10/2023; All expert discovery to be completed by 8/10/2023; and, Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than 8/31/2023. A joint status report shall be filed by 4/21/2023. This attached Scheduling Order having been issued, the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 7/13/2022 is hereby CANCELED. However, both the plaintiff and defendants shall file their respective Certifications in accordance with Rule 16b no later than 7/18/2022.(Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (McLaughlin, James) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Makita U.S.A., Inc. and Makita Corporation of America. (Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Makita U.S.A., Inc. and Makita Corporation of America. (Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (McLaughlin, James) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: SCHEDULING ORDER - All fact discovery to be completed by 3/31/2023; Expert disclosure under Rule 26 to be provided by the plaintiff no later than 4/28/2023, and by the defendants no later than 7/10/2023; All expert discovery to be completed by 8/10/2023; and, Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than 8/31/2023. A joint status report shall be filed by 4/21/2023. This attached Scheduling Order having been issued, the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 7/13/2022 is hereby CANCELED. However, both the plaintiff and defendants shall file their respective Certifications in accordance with Rule 16b no later than 7/18/2022.(Beatty, Barbara) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference Pursuant to Rule 16.1. (Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed (McLaughlin, James) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Michael Tillinghast.(McLaughlin, James) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by James M. McLaughlin on behalf of Michael Tillinghast (McLaughlin, James) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Makita U.S.A., Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Makita Corporation of America for Makita U.S.A., Inc... (Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Makita Corporation of America identifying Other Affiliate Makita U.S.A., Inc. for Makita Corporation of America.. (Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceThis hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2022 02:20 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT Record Makita Corporation of America summons served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; Makita U.S.A., Inc. summons served on 5/9/2022, answer due 5/31/2022.. (Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Makita Corporation of America.(Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Makita U.S.A., Inc..(Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docket(#4) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony V. Agudelo on behalf of Makita Corporation of America, Makita U.S.A., Inc. (Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Makita Corporation of America, Makita U.S.A., Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9333192 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Agudelo, Anthony) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAKITA U.S.A. LNC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony V. Agudelo