This case was last updated from PACER on 03/14/2020 at 08:35:02 (UTC).

TILLER v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 TILLER filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Renee Marie Bumb. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00452

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Renee Marie Bumb

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TOZINE TILLER

White Deer, PA 17887

Respondent

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

DIANA V. CARRIG

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

Us Post Office Building, 401 Market Street, 4Th Floor

Camden, NJ 08101

ANDREW CAREY

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, Suite 700

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE DISMISSAL. Ordered that the Clerk shall forward to petitioner a blank AO-243 form. ORDERED that if Petitioner wishes to reopen this case, he shall notify the Court within 30 days of entry of this order, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 3/4/2020. (rtm, )(nm) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

1 #4

Envelope

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Affidavit

1 #1

Memorandum of Law

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 14-699-06 (RMB), filed by TOZINE TILLER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Envelope)(cry, ) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE DISMISSAL. Ordered that the Clerk shall forward to petitioner a blank AO-243 form. ORDERED that if Petitioner wishes to reopen this case, he shall notify the Court within 30 days of entry of this order, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 3/4/2020. (rtm, )(nm) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 14-699-06 (RMB), filed by TOZINE TILLER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Envelope)(cry, ) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.