This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2022 at 08:30:33 (UTC).

Tikson v. Amica Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Tikson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Amica Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert S. Lasnik. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01584

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert S. Lasnik

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Parker Tikson

Defendant

Amica Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen Alexander Eggerman

Attorney at EGGERMAN LAW FIRM PS

520 Kirkland Way, Suite 400

Kirkland, WA 98033

Bradley Jerome Moore

Attorney at STRITMATTER KESSLER KOEHLER MOORE (SEA)

3600 15Th Ave Wste 300

Seattle, WA 98119-1330

Defendant Attorneys

Laura E Gage

Attorney at COLE WATHEN LEID HALL PC

222 Etruria St

Seattle, WA 98109

Rory W Leid, III

Attorney at COLE WATHEN LEID HALL PC

222 Etruria St

Seattle, WA 98109

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit A by Amica Mutual Insurance Company.(Gage, Laura) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; Length of Trial: 5-6 days. Jury Trial is set for 3/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 9/7/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/7/2022, Discovery completed by 11/6/2022, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 11/20/2022, Dispositive motions due by 12/6/2022, Motions in Limine due by 2/6/2023, Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2023, Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/1/2023, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 3/1/2023, Trial Exhibits due by 3/1/2023. (AD) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#11

(#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 6. (Leid, Rory) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Bradley Jerome Moore on behalf of Plaintiff Parker Tikson. (Moore, Bradley) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2022, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Defendant has provided evidence of plaintiff's demands for policy limits in excess of $75,000. The Order to Show Cause (Dkt. #3 ) is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

6 #1

Proposed Order

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Gage, Laura) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Gage, Laura) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant is hereby ordered to show cause why this matter should not be remanded to state court for having failed to "provide evidence establishing that it is more likely than not that the amount in controversy exceeds" $75,000. Show Cause Response due by 12/8/2021. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#2

(#2) LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - NOT submitted properly or NOT on file (Please refer to #LCR 101(b)(3) to file a proper jury demand) (RE) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit Ex. E

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. C

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. B

1 #1

Complaint Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit A by Amica Mutual Insurance Company.(Gage, Laura) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; Length of Trial: 5-6 days. Jury Trial is set for 3/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 9/7/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/7/2022, Discovery completed by 11/6/2022, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 11/20/2022, Dispositive motions due by 12/6/2022, Motions in Limine due by 2/6/2023, Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2023, Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/1/2023, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 3/1/2023, Trial Exhibits due by 3/1/2023. (AD) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 6. (Leid, Rory) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: At the direction of chambers and per the agreement of the parties, Initial Disclosure Deadline is extended to 1/7/2022. (AD) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Bradley Jerome Moore on behalf of Plaintiff Parker Tikson. (Moore, Bradley) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2022, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Defendant has provided evidence of plaintiff's demands for policy limits in excess of $75,000. The Order to Show Cause (Dkt. #3 ) is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of Laura E. Gage filed by Defendant Amica Mutual Insurance Company re re #3 Order to Show Cause, NOTED on motion calendar; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Gage, Laura) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE, by Defendant Amica Mutual Insurance Company, to re #3 Order to Show Cause, NOTED on motion calendar;. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gage, Laura) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Gage, Laura) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Gage, Laura) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docketre #3 Order to Show Cause, NOTED on motion calendar for 12/10/2021. (LH) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant is hereby ordered to show cause why this matter should not be remanded to state court for having failed to "provide evidence establishing that it is more likely than not that the amount in controversy exceeds" $75,000. Show Cause Response due by 12/8/2021. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - NOT submitted properly or NOT on file (Please refer to #LCR 101(b)(3) to file a proper jury demand) (RE) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketJudge Robert S. Lasnik added. (RE) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant Amica Mutual Insurance Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/1/2021. (RE) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-14399-3 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7345402), filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gage, Laura) Modified on 11/24/2021 to edit document titles. (RE) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amica Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rory W Leid, III