This case was last updated from PACER on 10/10/2020 at 09:32:00 (UTC).

Tiki Boatworks, LLC v. Crusin' Tikis, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 Tiki Boatworks, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Crusin' Tikis, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel J. Stewart and Thomas J. McAvoy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00907

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Stewart

Presiding Judge

Thomas J. McAvoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tiki Boatworks, LLC

Defendants

Crusin' Tikis, LLC

Gregory B. Darby Individually and d/b/a Crusin' Tikis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James D. Linnan

Attorney at Linnan & Associates PA

150 State Street, Suite 504

Albany, NY 12207

Defendant Attorney

Peter T. Shapiro

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - New York Office

77 Water Street, Suite 2100

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

7 #3

Memorandum of Law

7 #2

Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 to Affirmation

7 #1

Affirmation

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tiki Boatworks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 to Affirmation, #3 Memorandum of Law)(Linnan, James) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

4 #3

Memorandum of Law

4 #2

Exhibit(s) A

4 #1

Affidavit of Gregory D. Darby

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss or, alternatively, staying this case and compelling arbitration Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2020 10:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy Response to Motion due by 9/8/2020 Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/14/2020. filed by Crusin' Tikis, LLC, Gregory B. Darby. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gregory D. Darby, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Memorandum of Law) (Shapiro, Peter) Modified on 8/19/2020 (jel, ). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/11/2020 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/4/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit A & B to State Court Complaint

#2

(#2) STATE COURT RECORD filed by Crusin' Tikis, LLC and Gregory D. Darby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B to State Court Complaint) (dpk) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Affidavit of Service as to Cruisin' Tikis

1 #1

State Court Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Albany, case number 904624/2020 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5201289) filed by Crusin' Tikis, LLC and Gregory D. Darby. (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit A & B to State Court Complaint, #3 Affidavit of Service as to Cruisin' Tikis, #4 Affidavit of Service as to Gregory Darby, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tiki Boatworks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 to Affirmation, #3 Memorandum of Law)(Linnan, James) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER granting the #5 Letter Request for an extension of time to file papers in connection w/the pending #4 MOTION to Dismiss. The motion is adjourned to Senior Judge McAvoy's 10/13/2020 motion calendar. This motion will be ON SUBMIT; NO APPEARANCES ARE NECESSARY. Response to Motion due by 9/11/2020; Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/1/2020. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 9/3/2020. (amt) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter Motion from James D. Linnan for Tiki Boatworks, LLC requesting adjourn motion submitted to Judge McAvoy . (Linnan, James) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketTEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for September 11, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart and the deadline for the parties to file a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date pending a decision on the dispositive motion. (mab) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #4 Motion to Dismiss - Edited text to reflect alternative relief sought to stay case and compel arbitration. (jel, ) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss or, alternatively, staying this case and compelling arbitration Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2020 10:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy Response to Motion due by 9/8/2020 Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/14/2020. filed by Crusin' Tikis, LLC, Gregory B. Darby. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gregory D. Darby, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Memorandum of Law) (Shapiro, Peter) Modified on 8/19/2020 (jel, ). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docket***Answer due date updated for Crusin' Tikis, LLC answer due 8/18/2020; Gregory D. Darby answer due 8/18/2020. (dpk) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/11/2020 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/4/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT RECORD filed by Crusin' Tikis, LLC and Gregory D. Darby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B to State Court Complaint) (dpk) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Albany, case number 904624/2020 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5201289) filed by Crusin' Tikis, LLC and Gregory D. Darby. (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit A & B to State Court Complaint, #3 Affidavit of Service as to Cruisin' Tikis, #4 Affidavit of Service as to Gregory Darby, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter T. Shapiro Esq.