This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2022 at 09:48:52 (UTC).

Arsen Tigranyan v. BMW of North America, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Arsen Tigranyan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00438

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARSEN TIGRANYAN

Defendants

BMW of North America, LLC

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Martin Zolonz

Attorney at Law Offices of Adam Zolonz APC

1680 North Vine Street Suite 912

Los Angeles, CA 90028

Nicholas Ashley Bravo

Attorney at Bravo Law Firm APC

1050 West Alameda Avenue Suite 499

Burbank, CA 91506

Defendant Attorneys

Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Derrick Y Chu

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B- Answer to Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit C- Lease Agreement

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Chu, Derrick) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Chu, Derrick) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Chu, Derrick) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#5

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Jury Demand #3 served on January 20, 2022. (Chu, Derrick) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See attached document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/22/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (See minute order for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#11

(#11) JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT REPORT filed by Plaintiff Arsen Tigranyan. (Bravo, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#13

(#13) MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer. For reasons stated on the record, the scheduling conference is continued to March 31, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to file a joint report re Rule 68 offer for judgment by March 29, 2022. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (bm) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Arsen Tigranyan. PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF DEFENDANTS OFFER OF JUDGMENT DATED MARCH 4, 2022 (Bravo, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#15

(#15) JUDGMENT by Clerk. Pursuant to the Acceptance of Offer of Judgment, filed on March 15, 2022 #14 , judgment is entered for Plaintiff and against Defendant, pursuant to the conditions set for in the Offer of Judgment. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) JUDGMENT by Clerk. Pursuant to the Acceptance of Offer of Judgment, filed on March 15, 2022 #14 , judgment is entered for Plaintiff and against Defendant, pursuant to the conditions set for in the Offer of Judgment. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Arsen Tigranyan. PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF DEFENDANTS OFFER OF JUDGMENT DATED MARCH 4, 2022 (Bravo, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer. For reasons stated on the record, the scheduling conference is continued to March 31, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to file a joint report re Rule 68 offer for judgment by March 29, 2022. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (bm) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docket(#12) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Monday's 02/28/2022 scheduling conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT REPORT filed by Plaintiff Arsen Tigranyan. (Bravo, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/22/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (See minute order for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See attached document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Filed in State Court on 1/20/2022 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Does 1 through 50, inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Arsen Tigranyan. Filed in State Court on 1/20/222 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Jury Demand #3 served on January 20, 2022. (Chu, Derrick) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Chu, Derrick) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Chu, Derrick) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Chu, Derrick) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21GDCV01375 Receipt No: ACACDC-32656173 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- Lease Agreement) (Attorney Derrick Y Chu added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Chu, Derrick) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Derrick Y Chu

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate S Lehrman