This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2021 at 09:06:07 (UTC).

Tieszen v. EBay, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 Tieszen filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against EBay, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Schreier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-04002

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Tieszen

Defendants

Vapah, Inc.

LG Chem America, Inc.

LG Chem Ltd.

EBay, Inc.

First Doe through Thirtieth Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven S. Siegel

Attorney at Heidepriem, Purtell, Siegel & Hinrichs LLP

101 W. 69Th Street, Suite 105

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Shad E. Christman

Attorney at Heidepriem, Purtell, Siegel & Hinrichs LLP

101 W. 69Th Street, Suite 105

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy R. Shattuck

Attorney at Woods, Fuller, Shultz & Smith, PC

Po Box 5027, 336-3890, Fax: 339-3357

Sioux Falls, SD 57117-5027

Seth A. Lopour

Attorney at Woods, Fuller, Shultz & Smith PC

300 South Phillips Avenue, Suite 300

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

Stephen C. Landon

Attorney at Cadwell Sanford Deibert & Garry, LLP

200 E 10Th Street, Suite 200

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

Steven J. Oberg

Attorney at Lynn, Jackson, Shultz & Lebrun, P.C.

110 N. Minnesota Ave., Ste. 400

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Ryan Tieszen. (Christman, Shad) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#26

(#26) REPLY to Motion Response re #14 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Motion #14 filed by LG Chem America, Inc.. (Landon, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#25

(#25) AMENDED ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Vapah, Inc.. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Shad E. Christman on behalf of Ryan Tieszen. (Christman, Shad) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#23

(#23) (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven S. Siegel on behalf of Ryan Tieszen. (Siegel, Steven) Modified text on 2/4/2021 (JLS). (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#22

(#22) ORDER for Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on February 2, 2021. (DLC) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Vapah, Inc.. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#17

(#19) DECLARATION of Rebekah Long re #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration information, #2 Exhibit 2 - eBay September 30, 2008 User Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - eBay August 2012 update to User Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - eBay August 21, 2012 User Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - eBay September 29, 2016 User Agreement) (Oberg, Steven) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#14

(#20) RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ryan Tieszen. (Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Seth A. Lopour on behalf of Vapah, Inc.. (Lopour, Seth) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R. Shattuck on behalf of Vapah, Inc.. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#3

(#3) CONSENT to Removal signed by Defendant EBay, Inc. . (Oberg, Steven) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

2 #1

AO 85

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Rule 73 Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 85)(DLC) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Consent to Removal

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet

1 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LG Chem America, Inc. from Second Judicial Circuit, case number 49CIV20-003309. ($402.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3456017) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal)(DLC) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Ryan Tieszen. (Christman, Shad) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REPLY to Motion Response re #14 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Motion #14 filed by LG Chem America, Inc.. (Landon, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) AMENDED ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Vapah, Inc.. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Shad E. Christman on behalf of Ryan Tieszen. (Christman, Shad) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Filing Error: #23 Notice of Appearance was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven S. Siegel on behalf of Ryan Tieszen. (Siegel, Steven) Modified text on 2/4/2021 (JLS). (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER for Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on February 2, 2021. (DLC) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Vapah, Inc.. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ryan Tieszen. (Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DECLARATION of Rebekah Long re #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration information, #2 Exhibit 2 - eBay September 30, 2008 User Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - eBay August 2012 update to User Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - eBay August 21, 2012 User Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - eBay September 29, 2016 User Agreement) (Oberg, Steven) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Vapah, Inc. . (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) (FILED IN ERROR) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by EBay, Inc.. (Oberg, Steven) Modified text on 1/8/2021 (JLS). (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by EBay, Inc.. (Oberg, Steven) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Oberg on behalf of EBay, Inc.. (Oberg, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT to REMOVAL signed by Defendant Vapah, Inc. . (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Seth A. Lopour on behalf of Vapah, Inc.. (Lopour, Seth) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R. Shattuck on behalf of Vapah, Inc.. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT to Removal signed by Defendant EBay, Inc. . (Oberg, Steven) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Rule 73 Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 85)(DLC) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LG Chem America, Inc. from Second Judicial Circuit, case number 49CIV20-003309. ($402.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3456017) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal)(DLC) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EBAY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LG Chem America, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven J. Oberg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen C. Landon