This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/22/2022 at 08:15:11 (UTC).

Tidwell v. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 Tidwell filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Henry T. Wingate and LaKeysha Greer Isaac. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00272

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

Referral Judge

LaKeysha Greer Isaac

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lorraine Tidwell

Defendant

Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Damon R. Stevenson

Attorney at STEVENSON LEGAL GROUP, PLLC

1010 North West Street

Jackson, MS 39202

Defendant Attorney

Tabitha Bandi Kingma-Federal Gov

Attorney at U. S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - Jackson

501 East Court Street, Suite 4.430

Jackson, MS 39201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Certified Copy of State Court Record

1 #2

Supplement Copy of Summons and Complaint Served on Defendant

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2022 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: (888) 684-8852 PASSCODE: 3566012 (NL) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services (Kingma-Federal Gov, Tabitha) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services (Kingma-Federal Gov, Tabitha) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY and Cancelling Telephonic Case Management Conference set for July 19, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 6/2/22 (NL) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Extend July 22, 2022 Deadline by Lorraine Tidwell(In the Matter of the Estate of Joseph Davis Tidwell, Sr., Deceased, by Lorraine Tidwell as the Administratrix) (Stevenson, Damon) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Extend July 22, 2022 Deadline by Lorraine Tidwell(In the Matter of the Estate of Joseph Davis Tidwell, Sr., Deceased, by Lorraine Tidwell as the Administratrix) (Stevenson, Damon) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Docket***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. TCMC set for July 19, 2022. (NL) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY and Cancelling Telephonic Case Management Conference set for July 19, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 6/2/22 (NL) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services (Kingma-Federal Gov, Tabitha) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services (Kingma-Federal Gov, Tabitha) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2022 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: (888) 684-8852 PASSCODE: 3566012 (NL) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services from The Chancery Court of Hinds County, MS, case number 25CH1:20-pr-553. If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Copy of State Court Record, #2 Supplement Copy of Summons and Complaint Served on Defendant, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services is a litigant