This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2019 at 08:05:31 (UTC).

Tidwell et al v. A B C Insurance Co et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 Tidwell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against A B C Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Karen L Hayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01242

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Karen L Hayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenor Defendants

Eric Tidwell

Paula Tidwell

Intervenor Plaintiff

Zurich American Insurance Co of Illinois

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

Shane Fortenberry

ABC Insurance Company

Denbury Operating Company

A B C Insurance Co

Denbury Operating Co

Eric Tidwell

Denbury Operating Co Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jerome Harold Moroux

Attorney at Broussard & David

P O Box 3524

Lafayette, LA 70502-3524

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

Renee Summer Melchiode

Attorney at Melchiode Marks King

639 Loyola Ave Ste 2550

New Orleans, LA 70113

Defendant Attorneys

Richard J Hymel

Attorney at Mahtook & Lafleur (LAF)

P O Box 3089

Lafayette, LA 70502-3089

D Russell Holwadel

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel

400 Poydras St Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Heather England Reznik

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel

400 Poydras St Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Bruce R Hoefer, Jr

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel

400 Poydras St Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Phillip J Rew

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel

400 Poydras St Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #2

Proposed order

10 #1

Proposed pleading

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil cover sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint RULE 26(f) Report by All Parties. (aty,Moroux, Jerome) Modified on 11/21/2019 to add filers (Dauterive, C). (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by Zurich American Insurance Co of Illinois.(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 10/29/2019. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois identifying Corporate Parent American Zurich Insurance Company for Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois. (aty,Melchiode, Renee) Modified on 10/29/2019 to add Corporate Parents Steadfast Insurance Co, Zurich American Insurance Co, Zurich Holding Co of America Inc and Zurich Insurance Co Ltd (Dauterive, C). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Intervene with consent by Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Renee Summer Melchiode added to party Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois(pty:mov))(aty,Melchiode, Renee) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 11/13/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 10/25/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Denbury Operating Co.(aty,Holwadel, D) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Denbury Operating Co. (aty,Holwadel, D) Modified on 10/9/2019 to add Corporate Parent Denbury Holdings Inc (Dauterive, C). (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #2 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Bruce R Hoefer, Jr on behalf of Denbury Operating Co. Show Cause Response due by 10/23/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Shane Fortenberry.(aty,Hymel, Richard) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/25/2019. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Bruce R Hoefer, Jr, Phillip J Rew, Heather England Reznik, D Russell Holwadel on behalf of Denbury Operating Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/8/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO REMOVAL by Shane Fortenberry. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 of Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Denbury Operating Company answer due 9/30/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 5th JDC Richland Parish, Case Number 47273 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4056207) filed by Denbury Operating Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Consent to Removal, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney D Russell Holwadel added to party Denbury Operating Company(pty:dft))(aty,Holwadel, D) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC Insurance Co. is a litigant