This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 07:22:27 (UTC).

Tidwell et al v. 3M Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Tidwell filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Anna M Manasco. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00233

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anna M Manasco

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ricky Tidwell

Angela Tidwell

Defendants

Cabot CSC LLC

3M Company, Inc.

American Optical Corporation

Cabot Safety Corporation

Moldex-Metric, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John R Jacobs

Johnny Givens

Defendant Attorneys

Helen Kathryn Downs

Jennifer Marie Moore

Michael F. Walker

Brian Barry Hannula

Caroline M Upchurch

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by American Optical Corporation, Cabot CSC LLC. filed by American Optical Corporation, Cabot CSC LLC (Downs, Helen Kathryn) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

#20

(#20) INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with Appendices I, II and III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/21/2023. (FNC) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint, with Jury Demand by Cabot CSC LLC.(Downs, Helen Kathryn) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Givens on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Givens, Johnny) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint, with Jury Demand by Moldex-Metric, Inc..(Hannula, Brian) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

15 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#15

(#15) MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Johnny Givens by Ricky Tidwell, Angela Tidwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Jacobs, John) Modified on 3/1/2023 (AKD). (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Moldex-Metric, Inc.. filed by Moldex-Metric, Inc. (Hannula, Brian) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Barry Hannula on behalf of Moldex-Metric, Inc. (Hannula, Brian) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella hereby recuses himself from further participation in this case. Case reassigned to Judge Anna M Manasco for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 2/27/2023. (JLC) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Moldex-Metric, Inc. Consent to and Joinder in Notice of Removal (Upchurch, Caroline) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M Company, Inc.. filed by 3M Company, Inc. (Walker, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by 3M Company, Inc. Consent to and Joinder in Notice of Removal (Walker, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint, by American Optical Corporation.(Downs, Helen Kathryn) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Joinder and Consent to Removal by Cabot CSC LLC. (Downs, Helen Kathryn) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF A CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL. (JLC) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Optical Corporation from Jefferson County Circuit Court (Bessemer Division), case number 68-CV-2023-900042.00., filed by American Optical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(JLC) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by American Optical Corporation, Cabot CSC LLC. filed by American Optical Corporation, Cabot CSC LLC (Downs, Helen Kathryn) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with Appendices I, II and III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/21/2023. (FNC) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint, with Jury Demand by Cabot CSC LLC.(Downs, Helen Kathryn) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B-4043 (KAM) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Givens on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Givens, Johnny) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave for Johnny Givens to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Doc. #15 , is GRANTED. Counsel are reminded that at least one attorney for each party may be required to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/3/2023. (FNC) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint, with Jury Demand by Moldex-Metric, Inc..(Hannula, Brian) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Johnny Givens by Ricky Tidwell, Angela Tidwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Jacobs, John) Modified on 3/1/2023 (AKD). (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Moldex-Metric, Inc.. filed by Moldex-Metric, Inc. (Hannula, Brian) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Barry Hannula on behalf of Moldex-Metric, Inc. (Hannula, Brian) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT; The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Anna M. Manasco. Please use case number 2:23-CV-0233-AMM on all subsequent pleadings. (JLC) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella hereby recuses himself from further participation in this case. Case reassigned to Judge Anna M Manasco for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 2/27/2023. (JLC) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Moldex-Metric, Inc. Consent to and Joinder in Notice of Removal (Upchurch, Caroline) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M Company, Inc.. filed by 3M Company, Inc. (Walker, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by 3M Company, Inc. Consent to and Joinder in Notice of Removal (Walker, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint, by American Optical Corporation.(Downs, Helen Kathryn) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Joinder and Consent to Removal by Cabot CSC LLC. (Downs, Helen Kathryn) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF A CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL. (JLC) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT against 3M Company, Inc., American Optical Corporation, Cabot CSC LLC, Moldex-Metric, Inc., filed by Angela Tidwell, Ricky Tidwell. (Deemed filed 1/18/2023 in the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Bessemer Division, attached to the Notice of Removal as Exhibit A).(JLC) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Optical Corporation from Jefferson County Circuit Court (Bessemer Division), case number 68-CV-2023-900042.00., filed by American Optical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(JLC) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less