This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/17/2021 at 09:32:55 (UTC).

Tichy et al v. Hyatt et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Tichy filed an Other lawsuit against Hyatt. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John J. Tharp, Jr and Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00854

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John J. Tharp, Jr

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Karen Tichy

Maarten Albarda

Barry Bagnato

Defendants

Choice Hotels International Inc

Marriott International

Hyatt

Hilton Domestic Operating Company

Six Continents Hotels

Wyndham Hotel Group

Respondent

TravelPass Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter A. Shaeffer

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

455 North Cityfront Plaza Drive, Suite 2410

Chicago, IL 60611

Elaine T Byszewski

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

301 North Lake Avenue Suite 203

Pasadena, CA 91101

Jeannie Y Evans

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

455 North Cityfront Plaza Drive, Suite 2410

Chicago, IL 60611

Defendant Attorneys

Justin Wade Bernick

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Jacob D Koering

Attorney at Miller, Canfield, Paddock and Stone, P.L.C.

225 West Washington Street, Suite 2600

Chicago, IL 60606

Jordan Lee Ludwig

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

515 S Flower Street, 40Th Fl

Los Anglees, CA 90071

Shari Ross Lahlou

Attorney at Dechert LLP

1900 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1110

Adam Glenn Kelly

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60610

Christopher S. Yates

Attorney at Latham & Watkins Llp

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Sean M. Berkowitz

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

330 N. Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

Lohr A. Beck-Kemp

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Alexander G Gray

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309

Zachary Thomas Fardon

Attorney at King & Spalding

110 North Wacker Drive, Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60606

Jeffrey S. Cashdan

Attorney at King & Spalding

1180 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309

Danielle Chattin

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Michael K Molzberger

Attorney at Schiff Hardin

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

Paula J. Morency

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60605

Ann H. MacDonald

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60605

Robert J Wierenga

Attorney at Schiff Hardin Llp

350 South Main Street, Suite 210

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Respondent Attorney

Ruben A. Garcia

Attorney at LYNN PINKER HURST & SCHWEGMANN LLP

2100 Ross Ave Ste 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

25 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

RESTRICTED

#23

#22

#21

#20

19 #1

Exhibit 1

#19

#18

#3

2 #6

Exhibit Docket Sheet

2 #5

Exhibit 4- Protective Order

2 #4

Exhibit 3- Objection to Subpoena

2 #3

Exhibit 2- Original Complaint

2 #2

Exhibit 1- Amended Subpoena

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#1

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Telephone motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' motion to compel production of documents by Third-Party TravelPass Group #2 is granted in that TravelPass will produce for Plaintiffs' review those documents it has assembled for production to the FTC. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3/18/21 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Order Number: 40359. Court Reporter Contact Information: Frances Ward - wardofficialtranscripts@gmail.com - (312)435-5561. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2021. (Ward, Frances) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent TravelPass Group by Ruben Alan Garcia (Garcia, Ruben) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: TravelPass Group's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #21 is granted. Attorney Ruben Garcia is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of TravelPass Group. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17998019. (Garcia, Ruben) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Telephone hearing on Plaintiffs' motion to compel #2 is set for 3/18/2021 at 10:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Instructions and a link to the conference number are located on Judge Pallmeyer's website. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY by Plaintiffs Maarten Albarda, Barry Bagnato, Karen Tichy to motion to compel,, #2 Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Third-Party TravelPass (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Evans, Jeannie) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: TravelPass Group's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #16 is granted. Attorney Kent Davis Krabill is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of TravelPass Group. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE by TravelPass Groupin Opposition to #2 Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Amended Protective Order (E.D. Tex.), #2 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion to Compel)(Krabill, Kent) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17972748. (Krabill, Kent) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docket(#9) ORDER WITHDRAWING 5 Docket Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under (b)(1)(B) reference, 8 Docket Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under (b)(1)(A) remains in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 2/10/21. (dla) [Transferred from Utah on 2/16/2021.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docket(#8) DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. This Order corrects and supersedes 5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge dated 2/1/2021. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 2/10/21. (dla) [Transferred from Utah on 2/16/2021.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motions No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett: #3 Plaintiff's MOTION to Change Venue (Unopposed), #2 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Production of Documents By Third-Party in Response to Subpoena Documents. These motions will be handled by District Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. (lrh) [Transferred from Utah on 2/16/2021.] (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Maarten Albarda, Karen Tichy, Barry Bagnato (Sumsion, Steven) [Transferred from Utah on 2/16/2021.] (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 2/1/21. (dla) [Transferred from Utah on 2/16/2021.] (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to TravelPass Group. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh) [Transferred from Utah on 2/16/2021.] (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Plaintiff's MOTION to Change Venue (Unopposed) filed by Plaintiffs Maarten Albarda, Barry Bagnato, Karen Tichy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email from TravelPass to Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Subpeona)(Sumsion, Steven)[Transferred from Utah on 2/16/2021.] (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Production of Documents By Third-Party in Response to Subpoena Documents filed by Plaintiffs Maarten Albarda, Barry Bagnato, Karen Tichy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- Amended Subpoena, #3 Exhibit 2- Original Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3- Objection to Subpoena, #5 Exhibit 4- Protective Order)(Sumsion, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2021: #6 Exhibit Docket Sheet) (mh). [Transferred from Utah on 2/16/2021.] (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Case Filing Fee for Motion to Compel received from Plaintiffs Maarten Albarda, Barry Bagnato, Karen Tichy. (Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AUTDC-3896862). (Sumsion, Steven) [Transferred from Utah on 2/16/2021.] (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiffs Maarten Albarda, Barry Bagnato, Karen Tichy is directed to E-File the Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee (found under Other Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 49 by the end of the business day. Once the filing fee event is completed the initiating document (Motion to Compel and cover sheet ) may be E-filed.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh) [Transferred from Utah on 2/16/2021.] (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Travelpass Group LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Hyatt Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP LLC is a litigant