This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2020 at 15:23:49 (UTC).

Tice v. Murphy et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 Tice filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Murphy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew J. Kacsmaryk and Lee Ann Reno. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00146

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew J. Kacsmaryk

Referral Judge

Lee Ann Reno

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Tice

Defendants

Mark Murphy

New Prime, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas Dean Boyd

Attorney at Attorney Dean Boyd PLLC

4423 Sw 45Th Street

Amarillo, TX 79109

Defendant Attorneys

Robert James Collins

Attorney at Gauntt Koen Binney Woodall & Kidd LLP

14643 Dallas Parkway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75254

Karl W Koen

Attorney at Gaunnt Koen Binney Woodall & Kidd LLP

14643 Dallas Parkway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75254

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Agreed STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Mark Murphy, New Prime, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Collins, Robert) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER REGARDING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: All parties and attorneys required to attend the scheduling conference must attend by video. All other requirements remain in place, including the requirement that lead counsel for each represented party attend. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 7/1/2020) (awc) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER TO OBTAIN LOCAL COUNSEL: Within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, each party who is required to obtain local counsel shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/17/2020) (nhp) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/22/2020. FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2020 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3rd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/17/2020) (nhp) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 6/15/2020) (nhp) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (daa) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

1 #4

Certificate of Interested Parties

1 #3

Index of State Court Documents

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 251st Judicial District, Dallas County, case number 109713-C-CV filed by New Prime, Inc., Mark Murphy. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10877569) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Index of State Court Documents, #4 Certificate of Interested Parties) (Collins, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #7 . (daa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Agreed STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Mark Murphy, New Prime, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Collins, Robert) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REGARDING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: All parties and attorneys required to attend the scheduling conference must attend by video. All other requirements remain in place, including the requirement that lead counsel for each represented party attend. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 7/1/2020) (awc) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO OBTAIN LOCAL COUNSEL: Within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, each party who is required to obtain local counsel shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/17/2020) (nhp) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/22/2020. FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2020 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3rd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/17/2020) (nhp) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 6/15/2020) (nhp) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (daa) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 251st Judicial District, Dallas County, case number 109713-C-CV filed by New Prime, Inc., Mark Murphy. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10877569) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Index of State Court Documents, #4 Certificate of Interested Parties) (Collins, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW PRIME INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert James Collins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karl Wayne Koen