This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:14:36 (UTC).

Thweatt v. Rhodes et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Thweatt filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Rhodes. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry E. Hudson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00548

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry E. Hudson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Addie E. Thweatt

Defendants

Alvin F. Jones

Ronald T. Rhodes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Broome Thorsen

Attorney at ThorsenAllen, LLP

5413 Patterson Ave, Suite 201, P.O. Box 17094

Richmond, VA 23226

Defendant Attorneys

Micaylee Alexa Noreen

Attorney at Kaufman & Canoles PC (Norfolk)

150 W Main St, Suite 2100, Po Box 3037

Norfolk, VA 23510

Randy Carl Sparks, Jr.

Attorney at Kaufman & Canoles PC (Richmond)

1021 E Cary St Suite 1400, Two James Center, Po Box 27828

Richmond, VA 23219

Melissa Yvonne York

Attorney at Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman

Po Box 70280

Richmond, VA 23255

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Pretrial Schedule A

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 9:45 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#17

(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ronald T. Rhodes. (York, Melissa) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#16

(#16) Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Addie E. Thweatt. (Thorsen, James) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER that Rhodes's #11 Motion to File Under Seal the bus film of the Prince George County School Board is GRANTED. The Clerk shall immediately and permanently seal the bus film of the Prince George County School Board. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 8/20/2020. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Micaylee Alexa Noreen on behalf of Alvin F. Jones (Noreen, Micaylee) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#13

(#13) Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Ronald T. Rhodes re #12 Brief in Support, #11 MOTION to Seal (York, Melissa) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#12

(#12) Brief in Support to #11 MOTION to Seal filed by Ronald T. Rhodes. (York, Melissa) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

11 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION to Seal by Ronald T. Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(York, Melissa) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#10

(#10) Brief in Support to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ronald T. Rhodes. (York, Melissa) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ronald T. Rhodes. (York, Melissa) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#8

(#8) Defendant Alvin E. Jones' ANSWER to Complaint by Alvin F. Jones.(Sparks, Randy) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER that #6 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant Jones has until August 17, 2020, to file a responsive pleading. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 8/10/2020. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint by Alvin F. Jones. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Sparks, Randy). Modified docket text on 8/6/2020. (sbea,) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit 2

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7304928.), filed by Addie E. Thweatt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Thorsen, James) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 9:45 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ronald T. Rhodes. (York, Melissa) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Addie E. Thweatt. (Thorsen, James) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER that Rhodes's #11 Motion to File Under Seal the bus film of the Prince George County School Board is GRANTED. The Clerk shall immediately and permanently seal the bus film of the Prince George County School Board. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 8/20/2020. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Micaylee Alexa Noreen on behalf of Alvin F. Jones (Noreen, Micaylee) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Ronald T. Rhodes re #12 Brief in Support, #11 MOTION to Seal (York, Melissa) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Brief in Support to #11 MOTION to Seal filed by Ronald T. Rhodes. (York, Melissa) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Seal by Ronald T. Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(York, Melissa) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Brief in Support to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ronald T. Rhodes. (York, Melissa) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ronald T. Rhodes. (York, Melissa) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant Alvin E. Jones' ANSWER to Complaint by Alvin F. Jones.(Sparks, Randy) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER that #6 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant Jones has until August 17, 2020, to file a responsive pleading. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 8/10/2020. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint by Alvin F. Jones. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Sparks, Randy). Modified docket text on 8/6/2020. (sbea,) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER- THIS MATTER is before the Court on Defendant Ronald T. Rhodes's Consent Motion for an Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (the "Motion"), filed on August 3, 2020 (ECF No. 4). Defendant Rhodes requests an extension of time until August 17, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff consents to the Motion. Upon due consideration and agreement of counsel, the Motion is HEREBY GRANTED. Defendant Rhodes has until August 17, 2020, to file a responsive pleading. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 08/03/2020. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Ronald T. Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order)(York, Melissa) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Alvin F. Jones and Ronald T. Rhodes. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Addie E. Thweatt. (Thorsen, James) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7304928.), filed by Addie E. Thweatt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Thorsen, James) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less