This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2021 at 09:12:33 (UTC).

Thuy Thanh Alonzo v. Buffalo Exchange, Ltd et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 Thuy Thanh Alonzo filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Buffalo Exchange, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and Margo A. Rocconi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08521

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

Margo A. Rocconi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thuy Thanh Alonzo

Defendants

Buffalo Exchange, Ltd

Does 1 to 10 inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thiago Merlini Coelho

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Binyamin I Manoucheri

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wislhire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Jasmine Behroozan

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32229402 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo. (Attorney Thiago Merlini Coelho added to party Thuy Thanh Alonzo(pty:pla))(Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo, (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (et) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Buffalo Exchange, Ltd. (et) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (droj) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITY ACT (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (droj) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#11

(#11) MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than November 12, 2021. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act and other state law claims, if any, and the dismissal of any such claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) See order for more information. (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court reserves its ability to assess those factors again at a later stage of the proceedings. The Court therefore discharges the Order to Show Cause without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo, upon Defendant Buffalo Exchange, Ltd served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lauren Hendrie, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo, upon Defendant Buffalo Exchange, Ltd served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lauren Hendrie, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court reserves its ability to assess those factors again at a later stage of the proceedings. The Court therefore discharges the Order to Show Cause without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than November 12, 2021. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act and other state law claims, if any, and the dismissal of any such claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) See order for more information. (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITY ACT (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (droj) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (droj) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Buffalo Exchange, Ltd. (et) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (et) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo, (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32229402 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo. (Attorney Thiago Merlini Coelho added to party Thuy Thanh Alonzo(pty:pla))(Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Binyamin I Manoucheri

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thiago M. Coelho