This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 16:51:33 (UTC).

Thurgood v. Antelope Point Holdings LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 Thurgood filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Antelope Point Holdings LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan M Brnovich and Michael T Liburdi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-08236

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Susan M Brnovich

Michael T Liburdi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Thurgood

Defendants

Antelope Point Holdings LLC

Unknown Party

Hallum Incorporated

Golden Gate/SET Petroleum Partners of Nevada LLC

Diamond Trucking Incorporated

Antelope Point Holdings LLC dba Antelope Point Marina; an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Antelope Point Marina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David P Beitchman

Attorney at Beitchman & Zekian PC

16130 Ventura Blvd., Ste. 570

Encino, CA 91436

Jesse Morgan Showalter

Attorney at Robbins & Curtin PLLC

301 E Bethany Home Rd., Ste. B100

Phoenix, AZ 85012-3312

Paul Tokar

Attorney at Beitchman & Zekian PC

16130 Ventura Blvd., Ste. 570

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant Attorneys

Carl F Mariano

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Felice Franco Guerrieri

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

18 #1

Exhibit

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER (text only): IT IS ORDERED that, as a result of consolidation (Doc. #21 ) the 11/13/2019 status conference set in CV 19-8236 is vacated. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 10/7/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting (59) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:19-cv-08109-MTL. All future filings shall be in LEAD CASE No. CV-19-08109-PCT-MTL and use the above-referenced caption. Further, pursuant to the parties' Stipulation to Modify Rule 16 Scheduling Order, and good cause appearing, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting the 57 Stipulation. The following deadline extensions apply to this case. The deadline for joining parties, amending pleading sand filing supplemental pleadings is December 31, 2019. The deadline for final supplementation of Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot ("MIDP") responses and the completion of fact discovery is April 19, 2020. The deadline for Plaintiffs' expert disclosures is May 22, 2020. The deadline for Defendant's expert disclosures is June 26, 2020. The deadline for rebuttal expert disclosures is August 28, 2020. The deadline for expert depositions is August 28, 2020. The deadline for dispositive motions is September 28, 2020. The deadline for engaging in good faith settlement talks is September 15, 2020. There will be no further extensions absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report by October 11, 2019 addressing whether the 43 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and subsequent briefing remains pending and contested in light of the consolidation. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 10/3/19. (Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-08109-MTL, 3:19-cv-08236-SMB) (GMP) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Antelope Point Holdings LLC.(Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Summons Issued as to Diamond Trucking Incorporated, Golden Gate/SET Petroleum Partners of Nevada LLC, Hallum Incorporated. (WLP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Submitted by Ryan Thurgood. (Tokar, Paul) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Submitted by Ryan Thurgood. (Tokar, Paul) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Submitted by Ryan Thurgood. (Tokar, Paul) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by Ryan Thurgood.(Tokar, Paul) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Antelope Point Holdings LLC, Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: 19-cv-08109,19-cv-08236) (Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Antelope Point Holdings LLC.(Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ryan Thurgood: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on August 14, 2019 to Antelope Point Holdings LLC d/b/a Antelope Point Marina . (Tokar, Paul) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for David P Beitchman, Paul Tokar on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Thurgood. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 8/14/2019. (TCA) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER:Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on November 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 8/14/2019. (TCA) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17279655. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8236-PCT-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Ryan Thurgood. (Tokar, Paul) (DLC) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17279655 filed by Ryan Thurgood. (Tokar, Paul) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hallum Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Diamond S. Trucking is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carl F Mariano

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Felice Franco Guerrieri