This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2022 at 06:41:15 (UTC).

ThroughPuter Inc v. Microsoft Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 ThroughPuter Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Microsoft Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara J. Rothstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00344

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara J. Rothstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ThroughPuter Inc

Defendant

Microsoft Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

W Cook Alciati

Attorney at GARDELLA GRACE PA

80 M St Se, 1St Fl

Washington, DC 20003

Chad Ziegler

Attorney at GARDELLA GRACE PA

80 M St Se, 1St Fl

Washington, DC 20003

Michael Dorfman

Attorney at GARDELLA GRACE PA

80 M St Se, 1St Fl

Washington, DC 20003

Lawrence D Graham

Attorney at LOWE GRAHAM JONES PLLC

1325 Fourth Ave, Ste 1130

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Colvin

Attorney at FISH & RICHARDSON PC (DALLAS)

1717 Main St Ste 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

PRO HAC VICE PENDING

909 E Main St, Suite 1200

Richmond, VA 23219-3095

Ahmed J Davis

Attorney at FISH & RICHARDSON PC (DC)

1000 Main Ave Sw

Washington, DC 20024

Excylyn J Hardin-Smith

Attorney at FISH & RICHARDSON PC (NY)

7 Times Sq, 20Th Fl

New York, NY 10036

John S Goetz

Attorney at FISH & RICHARDSON PC (NY)

7 Times Sq, 20Th Fl

New York, NY 10036

Nichole Buck Vanderslice

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#102

(#102) ORDER STAYING CASE Pending Inter Partes Review. Having reconsidered its 6/1/2022 Order, the Court GRANTS Microsoft's motion (Dkt. #82 ) and stays this case pending resolution of Microsoft's petitions for inter partes review. The Court further ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report regarding the IPR proceedings no more than 10 days after the conclusion of those proceedings. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#101

(#101) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patricia A Eakes on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Eakes, Patricia) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#100

(#100) STIPULATION AND ORDER re Parties' #99 MOTION to Modify Order Setting Trial Dates and Related Dates. Jury Trial (5 days) is set for 11/13/2023 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Disclosure of Asserted Claims due 7/20/22. Joinder of Parties due by 8/4/2022, Non-infringement and invalidity contentions due 9/21/2022, Proposed terms and claim elements for construction due 10/11/2022, Proposed terms and Claim Elements and Preliminary Claim Chart due 11/8/2022, Joint Claim Construction due 12/6/2022, Construction Expert disclosures due 12/16/2022, Claim Construction Discovery to be completed by 1/10/2023, Opening Claim Construction briefs due 1/13/2023, Responsive Claim Construction briefs due 2/3/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 8/18/2022, Claim Construction Hearing set for 3/3/2023 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein, Fact Discovery to be completed by 3/23/2023, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/20/2023, Responsive Expert Disclosures due by 5/18/2023, Expert Discovery to be completed by 6/1/2023, Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 6/22/2023, Motions in Limine due by 10/6/2023, Joint Pretrial Statement due by 10/20/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2023 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#99

(#99) Joint Stipulated MOTION to Modify Order Setting Trial Dates and Related Dates and Proposed Order, filed by Plaintiff ThroughPuter Inc. (Alciati, W) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#98

(#98) Stipulated MOTION Agreement Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information And Proposed Order, filed by Plaintiff ThroughPuter Inc. (Alciati, W) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

82 #3

Proposed Order

82 #2

Exhibit B

82 #1

Exhibit A

82 #82

Main Document

2 #12

Exhibit 12

2 #11

Exhibit 11

2 #5

Exhibit 5

2 #4

Exhibit 4

2 #3

Exhibit 3

2 #2

Exhibit 2

2 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

217 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) ORDER STAYING CASE Pending Inter Partes Review. Having reconsidered its 6/1/2022 Order, the Court GRANTS Microsoft's motion (Dkt. #82 ) and stays this case pending resolution of Microsoft's petitions for inter partes review. The Court further ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report regarding the IPR proceedings no more than 10 days after the conclusion of those proceedings. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Per D. Jansen added for Microsoft Corporation; per #101 Notice of Appearance. (MW) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patricia A Eakes on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Eakes, Patricia) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) STIPULATION AND ORDER re Parties' #99 MOTION to Modify Order Setting Trial Dates and Related Dates. Jury Trial (5 days) is set for 11/13/2023 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Disclosure of Asserted Claims due 7/20/22. Joinder of Parties due by 8/4/2022, Non-infringement and invalidity contentions due 9/21/2022, Proposed terms and claim elements for construction due 10/11/2022, Proposed terms and Claim Elements and Preliminary Claim Chart due 11/8/2022, Joint Claim Construction due 12/6/2022, Construction Expert disclosures due 12/16/2022, Claim Construction Discovery to be completed by 1/10/2023, Opening Claim Construction briefs due 1/13/2023, Responsive Claim Construction briefs due 2/3/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 8/18/2022, Claim Construction Hearing set for 3/3/2023 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein, Fact Discovery to be completed by 3/23/2023, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/20/2023, Responsive Expert Disclosures due by 5/18/2023, Expert Discovery to be completed by 6/1/2023, Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 6/22/2023, Motions in Limine due by 10/6/2023, Joint Pretrial Statement due by 10/20/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2023 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) Joint Stipulated MOTION to Modify Order Setting Trial Dates and Related Dates and Proposed Order, filed by Plaintiff ThroughPuter Inc. (Alciati, W) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) Stipulated MOTION Agreement Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information And Proposed Order, filed by Plaintiff ThroughPuter Inc. (Alciati, W) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 5 days. Jury Trial is set for 8/14/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Statement of preliminary invalidity contentions due 7/7/2022, Non-infringement and invalidity contentions due 8/8/2022, Reports from expert witnesses regarding Markman issues due 8/8/2022, Rebuttal expert reports regarding Markman issues due 8/26/2022, Proposed terms and claim elements for construction due 8/26/2022, Proposed terms and Claim Elements and Preliminary Claim Chart due 9/26/2022, Joint claim chart due 11/9/2022, Opening claim construction briefs due 1/3/2023, Responsive claim construction briefs due 1/18/2023, Markman Hearing set for 3/3/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein, Joinder of Parties due by 7/22/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/17/2023, Discovery completed by 2/15/2023, Dispositive motions due by 3/17/2023, Motions in Limine due by 7/10/2023, Joint Pretrial Statement due by 7/17/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) ANSWER to #92 Amended Complaint,,,, Microsoft Corporation's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Microsoft Corporation.(Chen, Betty) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: five. (Alciati, W) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) MINUTE ORDER: The Court approves the case schedule proposed by the parties (Dkt. #93 -1). Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2022, Disclosure of Asserted Claims due by 7/20/2022, Non-infringement and Invalidity Contentions due by 9/21/2022, Proposed Terms of Construction due 10/11/2022, Preliminary Claim Construction due 11/14/2022, Joint Claim Construction and Construction Expert Disclosures due 12/21/2022, Claim Construction Discovery to be completed by 2/8/2023, Opening Claim Construction Briefs due 2/15/2023, Responsive Claim Construction Briefs due 3/15/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2023. (see order for further specifics) Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Microsoft Corporation by ThroughPuter, Inc.. (Helge, Wayne) [Transferred from vaed on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by ThroughPuter, Inc.. (Helge, Wayne) [Transferred from vaed on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne Michael Helge on behalf of ThroughPuter, Inc. (Helge, Wayne) [Transferred from vaed on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by ThroughPuter, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Notice of Filing of Exhibits (28-33)) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28, #2 Exhibit 29, #3 Exhibit 30, #4 Exhibit 31, #5 Exhibit 32, #6 Exhibit 33)(Helge, Wayne) [Transferred from vaed on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by ThroughPuter, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Notice of Filing of Exhibits (27-1 to 27-3)) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27-1, #2 Exhibit 27-2, #3 Exhibit 27-3)(Helge, Wayne) [Transferred from vaed on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by ThroughPuter, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Notice of Filing of Exhibits (14-26)) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14, #2 Exhibit 15, #3 Exhibit 16, #4 Exhibit 17, #5 Exhibit 18, #6 Exhibit 19, #7 Exhibit 20, #8 Exhibit 21, #9 Exhibit 22, #10 Exhibit 23, #11 Exhibit 24, #12 Exhibit 25, #13 Exhibit 26)(Helge, Wayne) [Transferred from vaed on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by ThroughPuter, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Notice of Filing of Exhibits (13-4 to 13-6)) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13-4, #2 Exhibit 13-5, #3 Exhibit 13-6)(Helge, Wayne) [Transferred from vaed on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by ThroughPuter, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Notice of Filing of Exhibits (13-1 to 13-3)) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13-1, #2 Exhibit 13-2, #3 Exhibit 13-3)(Helge, Wayne) [Transferred from vaed on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by ThroughPuter, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Notice of Filing of Exhibits (1-12)) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Helge, Wayne) [Transferred from vaed on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint For Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7699862.), filed by ThroughPuter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Helge, Wayne) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/1/2021) (jsmi, ).[Transferred from vaed on 3/24/2022.] (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less