This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2022 at 09:14:53 (UTC).

Thresher-Martin v. MUY Hamburger Partners, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 Thresher-Martin filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against MUY Hamburger Partners, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas M. Rose and Sharon L. Ovington. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00315

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Rose

Referral Judge

Sharon L. Ovington

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Savannah Thresher-Martin

Defendant

MUY Hamburger Partners, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew G Bruce

Brianna Renay Carden

Evan R McFarland

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony David Dick

Franklin Zachary Wolf

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint in State Court Action

1 #3

Exhibit B - Notice to State Court of Removal

1 #4

Exhibit C - Notice to Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Counsel of Filing of Notice

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant MUY Hamburger Partners, LLC. (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#3

(#3) (Copy) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against MUY Hamburger Partners, LLC. originally filed in Court of Common Pleas Court For Montgomery County, Ohio on October 18, 2021 under case number 2021 CV 04268 filed by Savannah Thresher-Martin. (srb) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Defendant MUY Hamburger Partners, LLC Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant MUY Hamburger Partners, LLC. (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#7

(#7) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Notice of Affirmative Defenses filed by MUY Hamburger Partners, LLC. (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Notice of Affirmative Defenses filed by MUY Hamburger Partners, LLC. (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Franklin Z. Wolf Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Please Note: Co-counsel is also directed to contact the Clerk's office for the Southern District of Ohio with the appropriate e-mail address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 12/09/2021. (jmb) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8629499) of Anthony D Dick by Defendant MUY Hamburger Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant MUY Hamburger Partners, LLC. (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Defendant MUY Hamburger Partners, LLC Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) (Copy) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against MUY Hamburger Partners, LLC. originally filed in Court of Common Pleas Court For Montgomery County, Ohio on October 18, 2021 under case number 2021 CV 04268 filed by Savannah Thresher-Martin. (srb) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant MUY Hamburger Partners, LLC. (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action From State Court to Federal Court from Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-cv-04268 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8599728), filed by MUY Hamburger Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint in State Court Action, #3 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court of Removal, #4 Exhibit C - Notice to Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Counsel of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less