This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/21/2023 at 07:49:35 (UTC).

Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A hereto

Case Summary

On 02/20/2023 Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Franklin U. Valderrama. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01005

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Franklin U. Valderrama

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC

Defendant

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A hereto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Payton Mcmurray

Michael A. Hierl

William Benjamin Kalbac

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) MOTION by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#31

(#31) SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC (Document not scanned). (jg, ) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

#30

RESTRICTED

#29

(#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: For the reasons stated in the motions, the Court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 , Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #9 and ex parte motion for a temporary restraining order #10 . Provided that Plaintiff provides the security described in paragraph 9 of the temporary restraining order, the temporary restraining order shall become effective on April 11, 2023 at 6:00 p.m. and shall expire in fourteen (14) days from the effective date. The Court finds that joinder of the "Schedule A" Defendants is proper at this preliminary stage. Fed. R. Civ. P. 20(a)(2)(A). The Court notes that no Defendants are prejudiced by permitting joinder at this juncture. See Bose Corp. v. Partnerships & Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", 334 F.R.D. 511, 517 (N.D. Ill. 2020). To the extent any Defendant appears and objects to joinder, the Court will revisit the issue and is free to sever certain defendants from the case under Rule 21 at that time. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

#28

(#28) MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (jg, ) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#27

(#27) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (jg, ) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#26

(#26) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jg, ) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#10

(#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: For the reasons stated in the motions, the Court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 , Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #9 and ex parte motion for a temporary restraining order #10 . Provided that Plaintiff provides the security described in paragraph 9 of the temporary restraining order, the temporary restraining order shall become effective on April 11, 2023 at 6:00 p.m. and shall expire in fourteen (14) days from the effective date. The Court finds that joinder of the "Schedule A" Defendants is proper at this preliminary stage. Fed. R. Civ. P. 20(a)(2)(A). The Court notes that no Defendants are prejudiced by permitting joinder at this juncture. See Bose Corp. v. Partnerships & Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", 334 F.R.D. 511, 517 (N.D. Ill. 2020). To the extent any Defendant appears and objects to joinder, the Court will revisit the issue and is free to sever certain defendants from the case under Rule 21 at that time. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

#9

(#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: For the reasons stated in the motions, the Court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 , Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #9 and ex parte motion for a temporary restraining order #10 . Provided that Plaintiff provides the security described in paragraph 9 of the temporary restraining order, the temporary restraining order shall become effective on April 11, 2023 at 6:00 p.m. and shall expire in fourteen (14) days from the effective date. The Court finds that joinder of the "Schedule A" Defendants is proper at this preliminary stage. Fed. R. Civ. P. 20(a)(2)(A). The Court notes that no Defendants are prejudiced by permitting joinder at this juncture. See Bose Corp. v. Partnerships & Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", 334 F.R.D. 511, 517 (N.D. Ill. 2020). To the extent any Defendant appears and objects to joinder, the Court will revisit the issue and is free to sever certain defendants from the case under Rule 21 at that time. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

#6

(#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: For the reasons stated in the motions, the Court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 , Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #9 and ex parte motion for a temporary restraining order #10 . Provided that Plaintiff provides the security described in paragraph 9 of the temporary restraining order, the temporary restraining order shall become effective on April 11, 2023 at 6:00 p.m. and shall expire in fourteen (14) days from the effective date. The Court finds that joinder of the "Schedule A" Defendants is proper at this preliminary stage. Fed. R. Civ. P. 20(a)(2)(A). The Court notes that no Defendants are prejudiced by permitting joinder at this juncture. See Bose Corp. v. Partnerships & Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", 334 F.R.D. 511, 517 (N.D. Ill. 2020). To the extent any Defendant appears and objects to joinder, the Court will revisit the issue and is free to sever certain defendants from the case under Rule 21 at that time. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

1 #3

Exhibit 2 Part 2

1 #2

Exhibit 2 Part 1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC (Document not scanned). (jg, ) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SEALED TEMPORARY Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 4/6/2023. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: For the reasons stated in the motions, the Court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 , Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #9 and ex parte motion for a temporary restraining order #10 . Provided that Plaintiff provides the security described in paragraph 9 of the temporary restraining order, the temporary restraining order shall become effective on April 11, 2023 at 6:00 p.m. and shall expire in fourteen (14) days from the effective date. The Court finds that joinder of the "Schedule A" Defendants is proper at this preliminary stage. Fed. R. Civ. P. 20(a)(2)(A). The Court notes that no Defendants are prejudiced by permitting joinder at this juncture. See Bose Corp. v. Partnerships & Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", 334 F.R.D. 511, 517 (N.D. Ill. 2020). To the extent any Defendant appears and objects to joinder, the Court will revisit the issue and is free to sever certain defendants from the case under Rule 21 at that time. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (jg, ) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (jg, ) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jg, ) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding memorandum in support of motion, #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC Exhibit 3 Part 12 of Gorman Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, ) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, ) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20362534. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less